This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:24:01 (UTC).

REFUGIO CABANILLAS VS NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 REFUGIO CABANILLAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6296

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABANILLAS REFUGIO

Defendants

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

SELECT PORTOLIO SERVING INC.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CDLG PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PAINO BRIAN A. ESQ.

SUMMERFIELD ADAM F.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/7/2016: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE ? 2923.6; ETC

1/7/2016: PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE ? 2923.6; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/29/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/4/2016: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/4/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE ? 2924.10; ETC.

2/4/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE ? 2924.10; ETC.

DECLARATION OF ADAM F. SUMMERFIELD PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. ? 430.41

2/11/2016: DECLARATION OF ADAM F. SUMMERFIELD PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. ? 430.41

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AMENDED S&C

2/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AMENDED S&C

DEFENDANTS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. AND U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE?S ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF REFUGIO CABANILLAS

3/4/2016: DEFENDANTS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. AND U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE?S ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF REFUGIO CABANILLAS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/7/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/7/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

3/9/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Minute Order

3/15/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/15/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER FOR REMAND

4/26/2016: ORDER FOR REMAND

NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

5/27/2016: NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Minute Order

6/7/2016: Minute Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; (Motion; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Refugio Cabanillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Refugio Cabanillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO STRIKE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Select Portolio Serving, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Refugio Cabanillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Refugio Cabanillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE 2923.6; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Refugio Cabanillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

f' ® ORMINAL

TONY CARA, ESQ. SBN 170720 EILED

CDLG, PC | Superior Court of Caiifornia

2973 Harbor Blvd, Suite # 594 iy of Los Angeles

Costa Mesa, CA 92626 | AUG 01 o1

Phone: (888) 615-6765 . . 016

Fax: (888) 660-8874 Sherri B, Carter, Exgeutive Officer/Clerk

Email: cdiglawyer@gmail.com By . Deputy . “ : Raul Sanchez

Attorney for Plaintiff, |

REFUGIO CABANILLAS SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL DISTRICT

REFUGIO CABANILLAS, | _ CASE NO. BC606296

Plaintiff, - Assigned to Honorable Elizabeth A. White

PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FIRST | AMENDED COMPLAINT

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC; | and DOES 1-10, inclusive, Hearing Set: A . | Date: August 22,2016 Time: 8:30 a.m.

Defendants. , Dept.: 48 - Res. No. 160503125314

Action Filed: February 4, 2016 Trial Set: May 16, 2017

Plaintiff, REFUGIO CABANILLAS (hereinafter “Plaintiff”), by and through his counsel, | brings this Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Defendant SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (“SPS”) to his First Amended Complaint (“FAC”).

Plaintiff’s Opposition is based on these opposing papers, the attached Memorandum of Points

and Authorities, and on the complete documents and records of this action on file with this Court and

on such other oral and/or documentary evidence as may be presented at the hearing on this Motion. -

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant