This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 02:04:34 (UTC).

REDESIGN GROUP, INC. VS WILLLIAM J. BARGER, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 REDESIGN GROUP, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WILLLIAM J BARGER, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5446

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

REDESIGN GROUP INC

DAVID H. LAU & ASSOCIATES INC.

DANNY'S PLASTERING

CASTANO GEORGE

H&R CONSTRUCTION AND SURFACING INC.

KOENIG RANDALL F.

NARAGHI LADAN

NEW CENTURY BUILDERS & DEVELOPERS INC.

MOES

PLASTERING DANNY'S

MELENDEZ-MEJIA DANIEL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA

NEMANI LILLY L.

MUTUAL OF OMAHA

BARBER LILLY L.

BARBER WILLIAM J.

DAVID H. LAU & ASSOCIATES INC.

JF LANDSCAPE INC. (MOE 3)

WORLD PRECAST CONCRETE

ESQUIVEL MIGUEL

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

REDESIGN GROUP INC

KOENIG RANDALL F.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ABDULAZIZ GROSSBART & RUDMAN

MCMAHON LAW FIRM

FIRM MCMAHON LAW

RUDMAN BRUCE D.

SMIGLIANI PAUL WILLIAM

EUM MARGARET

DAWLEY KIM LOAN THI

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

CKR LAW

EUM ESQ. DAVID

SOBEL & ASSOCIATES

MARKS ESQ. GREGORY W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROGERS & HARRIS

RUTTENBERG KENNETH G.

OBERLE BRYAN

EUM DAVID INN

 

Court Documents

Notice

5/21/2019: Notice

Request for Dismissal

5/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

4/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

3/7/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/7/2019: Minute Order

Order

2/27/2019: Order

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

Reply

2/26/2019: Reply

Reply

2/26/2019: Reply

Opposition

2/25/2019: Opposition

Opposition

2/25/2019: Opposition

Declaration

2/20/2019: Declaration

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

2/20/2019: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Declaration

2/20/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

2/20/2019: Ex Parte Application

Motion in Limine

2/13/2019: Motion in Limine

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (/ Entry of Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by William J. Barber (Cross-Complainant); Lilly L. Nemani (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by David H. Lau Associates, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by William J. Barber (Defendant); Lilly L. Barber (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (/ Entry of Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) / Entry of Jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Redesign Group, Inc, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 10:46 AM in Department M; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
267 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Petition (TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Redesign Group, Inc, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Petition; Filed by William J. Barber (Defendant); Lilly L. Nemani (Defendant); Lilly L. Barber (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Redesign Group, Inc, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Redesign Group, Inc, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Redesign Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JF LANDSCAPE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where H & R CONSTRUCTION AND SURFACING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW CENTURY BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS INC. is a litigant