Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 11:54:31 (UTC).

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION LLC ET AL VS OSTEROID ENTERPRISES L

Case Summary

On 01/31/2013 RED WHITE DISTRIBUTION LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OSTEROID ENTERPRISES L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN, JAMES C. CHALFANT, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, BARBARA A. MEIERS, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY, EDWARD B. MORETON and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0304

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

BARBARA A. MEIERS

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

EDWARD B. MORETON

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

LENDING SOLUTION CORP.

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION LLC

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION SACRAMENTO LLC

OSTER ERIC

OSTEROID ENTERPRISES LLC

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Petitioners and Appellants

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION LLC

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTIN SACRAMENTO LLC

CHEBAN MIKHAIL

DOES 1 - 5

OSTER ERIC

OSTEROID ENTERPRISES LLC

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISES LLC (BC500459)

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC

MESEONZNIK ALEX

PACIFIC COAST FOOD

PACIFIC FOOD

LENDING SOLUTION CORP

PACIFIC COST CO

PACIFIC FOOD DISTRIBUTION

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 5

OSTER ERIC

OSTEROID ENTERPRISES LLC

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISES LLC (BC500459)

PACIFIC COAST FOOD

PACIFIC FOOD

PACIFIC COST CO

PACIFIC FOOD DISTRIBUTION

Cross Defendant

ZAIKOVATY SAM

Not Classified By Court

MIKHAIL CHEBAN

KOZBERG & BODELL LLP

HONG ELSEY JANE

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GENTINO ROBERT ESQ.

GENTINO ROBERT E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BAYER KENNETH H. ESQ.

ROSEN ROGER M. ESQ.

COTTONE & MOON

BODELL GREGORY SCOTT

MENDLIN JOYCE S.

BODELL GREGORY ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT GENTINO

Cross Defendant Attorney

BAUSH NATALIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/11/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order -

4/13/2018: Minute Order -

Proof of Service -

5/22/2018: Proof of Service -

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ROGER ROSEN AND EXHIBITS FILED IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

1/21/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ROGER ROSEN AND EXHIBITS FILED IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER NOTICE ...)

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER NOTICE ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Objection - OBJECTION BY RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION SACRAMENTO LLC AND MIKHAIL CHEBAN TO "EVIDENCE" PROFFERED BY OSTEROID ENTERPRISES, LLC AND TATIANA SEDYCHEVA IN OPPOSITION TO FOR SATISFACTION

2/28/2020: Objection - OBJECTION BY RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION SACRAMENTO LLC AND MIKHAIL CHEBAN TO "EVIDENCE" PROFFERED BY OSTEROID ENTERPRISES, LLC AND TATIANA SEDYCHEVA IN OPPOSITION TO FOR SATISFACTION

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT[PROPOSED]

4/14/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT[PROPOSED]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT CRE...)

10/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT CRE...)

COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

1/31/2013: COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHERRI MATTA

5/13/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHERRI MATTA

Minute Order -

6/11/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

12/10/2013: Minute Order -

THE OSTEROID PARTIES? OPPOSITION TO ALEX MESEONZNIK?S MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

1/6/2014: THE OSTEROID PARTIES? OPPOSITION TO ALEX MESEONZNIK?S MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE OSTEROID PARTIES? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

1/6/2014: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE OSTEROID PARTIES? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

NOTICE OF RULING FROM EX PARTE HEARING ON 25, 2014 RE: OSTEROID ENTERPRISES, LLC AND ERIC OSTER?S APPLICATION TO IMMEDIATE LV ASSIGN JUDGE TO CASES NO. BCSO 0304 AND BC500459 AND RESCHEDULE HEARING DA

3/12/2014: NOTICE OF RULING FROM EX PARTE HEARING ON 25, 2014 RE: OSTEROID ENTERPRISES, LLC AND ERIC OSTER?S APPLICATION TO IMMEDIATE LV ASSIGN JUDGE TO CASES NO. BCSO 0304 AND BC500459 AND RESCHEDULE HEARING DA

Minute Order -

5/16/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/23/2014: Minute Order -

492 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other for an Order Requiring Judgment Creditors Osteroid Enterprises LLC and Tatiana Sedycheva to Deliver an Acknowledgement of Full or Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (Time estimate: 2 days)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance of Evidentiary Hearing) of 01/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Evidentiary Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Trial/Evidentiary Hearing and Final Status Conference); Filed by Red & White Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff); Mikhail Cheban (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Evidentiary Hearing); Filed by Mikhail Cheban (Appellant); Red & White Distributin Sacramento, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (ReEvidentiary Hearing) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion - Other (for an Order Requiring Judgment Creditors Osteroid Enterprises LLC and Tatiana Sedycheva to Deliver an Acknowledgement of Full or Partial Satisfaction of Judgment (NO HEARING ON 11/5/2020)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
445 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Osteroid Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); Eric Oster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Red & White Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Red & White Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Red & White Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC500304    Hearing Date: June 23, 2020    Dept: 74

BC500304 RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION vs OSTEROID ENTERPRISES

Plaintiffs Red & White Distribution, LLC, Red & White Distribution Sacramento, LLC and Mikhail Cheban’s Motion for Satisfaction of Judgment

TENTATIVE RULING: The court intends to set an evidentiary hearing regarding (i) which portion of the judgment has been satisfied and (ii) whether or not there is an issue regarding attorneys’ fees under the provision of the Stipulation For Judgment. (Red & White Distribution, LLC v. Osteroid Enterprises, LLC, (2019) 38 Cal. App. 5th 582, 590, review denied (Oct. 23, 2019).) However, based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and the states of emergency having been declared by Governor Gavin Newsom and President Donald Trump, the General Orders issued by the Presiding Judge and Statewide Orders issued by the Chief Justice, the court cannot set a firm date at this time. Therefore, the court sets a status conference for August 4, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel should come prepared to discuss whether the parties stipulate to conduct the evidentiary hearing entirely remotely by video appearance or whether some in-court testimony/argument will be presented.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST FOODS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LENDING SOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant