Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 10:24:35 (UTC).

REBECCA PATINO VS JACOBS FACILITIES INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2012 REBECCA PATINO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JACOBS FACILITIES INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0477

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

PATINO REBECCA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JACOBS FACILITIES INCORPORATED

PREMIER BUILDING MAINTENANCE

JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

PREMIER BUILDING MAINTENANCE (ERRON. SUED

ABM FACILITY SERVICES/DOE II

PASADENA CONSTRUCTION CO. & INTERIORS

PBMS INC.

PASADENA CONSTRUCTION CO. & INTERIORS INC

PREMIER BUILDING MAINTENANCE ERRON. SUED

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PASADENA CONSTRUCTION CO. & INTERIORS

ROE 1:PBMS INC.DBA PREMIER BUILD. MAINT.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOBSMA LAILA HAVRE

ROBERSON KIMBALL & JALTOROSSIAN

JACOBSMA & BRAU

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SULLIVAN BALLOG & WILLIAMS LLP

BRADY VORWERCK & RYDER

COLLINSON LAW

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

WAYNE & ASSOCIATES

DECLUES BURKETT & THOMPSON LLP

LAW COLLINSON

MORRISON LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR

4/10/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR

Minute Order -

4/25/2013: Minute Order -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/7/2013: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS-DEFENDANT PASADENA CONSTRUCTION & INTERIORS, INC.?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

7/8/2013: CROSS-DEFENDANT PASADENA CONSTRUCTION & INTERIORS, INC.?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

PASADENA CONSTRUCTION & INTERIORS, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

7/8/2013: PASADENA CONSTRUCTION & INTERIORS, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES; ETC.

9/25/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES; ETC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

9/26/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

NOTICE OF RULING

9/26/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

DEFENDANT ABM INDUSTRIES INC.?S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/5/2013: DEFENDANT ABM INDUSTRIES INC.?S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT 0F CASE AND ORDER

1/7/2014: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT 0F CASE AND ORDER

DEFENDANT JACOBS PROJECT MAANGEMENT CO. NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT-IN-INTERVENTION ARM INDUSTRIES, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIIMS, INC.?S APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD F

1/10/2014: DEFENDANT JACOBS PROJECT MAANGEMENT CO. NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT-IN-INTERVENTION ARM INDUSTRIES, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIIMS, INC.?S APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD F

DEFENDANT-IN-INTERVENTION ABM INDUSTRIES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION CONTESTING PBMS, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

1/22/2014: DEFENDANT-IN-INTERVENTION ABM INDUSTRIES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION CONTESTING PBMS, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/4/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

3/21/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT ABM INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION CONTESTING PBMS, INC.?S APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OFF CALENDAR

4/8/2014: NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT ABM INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION CONTESTING PBMS, INC.?S APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OFF CALENDAR

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/10/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/16/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Osc Re Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by REBECCA PATINO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (entire action w/prej ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT, CO. ON 4/4/12 ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' COMPLAINT- IN-INTERVENTION AS TO ALL PARTIES. ); Filed by Attorney for Intervenor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by Intervenor

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention; Filed by LOS ANGELES, COUNTY OF (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention (SUMMONS ISSUED ***DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ON JULY 10, 2014*** ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION ); Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF FILING OF THIRD PARTY ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM FACILITY SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant