This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 00:18:04 (UTC).

REAL ESTATE AND CONSULTING SERVICES INC ET AL VS ROBERTO GOM

Case Summary

On 04/04/2012 REAL ESTATE AND CONSULTING SERVICES INC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against ROBERTO GOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES F. PALMER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2038

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHARLES F. PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GONZALEZ TERESA

REAL ESTATE AND COUNSULTING SERVICES INC

Defendants and Respondents

GOMEZ ROBERTO

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCHLECHT KARL P. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GOLDOWITZ MARK

METHENY RYAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: I. LIBEL PER SE; ETC

4/4/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: I. LIBEL PER SE; ETC

SUMMONS -

4/4/2012: SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. 425.16)

5/4/2012: DEFENDANT?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. 425.16)

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. 425.16)

5/4/2012: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. 425.16)

DECLARATION OF ROBERTO GOMEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. ? 425.16)

5/7/2012: DECLARATION OF ROBERTO GOMEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. ? 425.16)

DECLARATION OF HECTOR TAVARA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.CF425.16)

9/12/2012: DECLARATION OF HECTOR TAVARA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.CF425.16)

DEFENDANT?S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. ? 425.16)

9/18/2012: DEFENDANT?S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS A MERITLESS SLAPP (C.C.P. ? 425.16)

DEFENDANT?S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

9/18/2012: DEFENDANT?S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS? OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order -

10/12/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

10/23/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

DECLARATION OF RICHARD PEARL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROBERTO GOMEZ?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS (C.C.P. ? 425.16(C))

12/7/2012: DECLARATION OF RICHARD PEARL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROBERTO GOMEZ?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS (C.C.P. ? 425.16(C))

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES; DECLARATION OF ERIK S. VELIE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/25/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES; DECLARATION OF ERIK S. VELIE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARK GOLDOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES AND, COSTS

1/31/2013: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARK GOLDOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES AND, COSTS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT

10/4/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY -

10/10/2013: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY -

NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

11/5/2013: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

12/30/2013: NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT -

3/5/2014: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT -

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketREMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketWrit-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketWrit-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketNtc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketNOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketRESPONDENTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF MOVING PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Real Estate and Counsulting Services, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Real Estate and Counsulting Services, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: I. LIBEL PER SE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Real Estate and Counsulting Services, Inc (Plaintiff); Teresa Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Real Estate Consulting and Services, Inc. is a litigant