This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 06:36:25 (UTC).

RAY MING VS ALLAN LEE HANES

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 RAY MING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLAN LEE HANES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6663

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MING RAY

Defendants

DOES 1-40

ALLAN LEE HANES CONSTRUCTION

HANES ALLAN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIMM J. MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

PAIGE ROBERT N.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/10/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/22/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY FEES

2/21/2017: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY FEES

Minute Order

2/8/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

1/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/24/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

1/12/2017: SUMMONS

DEFENDANT'S CROSS COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION, APPOINTMENT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

1/12/2017: DEFENDANT'S CROSS COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION, APPOINTMENT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

1/12/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/26/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/12/2016: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

10/12/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice (OF ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department ATV15, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding; Motion (1. TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FORADMISSION; FILED BY DEFTS2. OSC RE: DISMISSAL) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (P&A'S IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department ATV15, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding; Motion (TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FORADMISSION; FILED BY DEFTS**PLTF FILED A DISMISSAL ON10/10/17**) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Motion-In Limine (#9 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Motion-In Limine (#8 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Motion-In Limine (#'S 1-7 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Motion-In Limine (#10 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Notice of Motion (TO DEEM ADMITED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION 11/16/17 8:30AM A15 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Declaration (OF ROBERT PAIGE IN SUPPORT OR MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • Summons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (ALLEN LEE HANES DBA ALLEN LEE HANES CONSTRUCTION ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (DEFT/XCOMP ALLEN LEE HANES DBA ALLEN LEE HANES CONSTRUCTION ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Proof of Service (AMENDED SUMMONS/COMPLAINT SERVED DEFT ON 10/31/16 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AMENDED SUMMONS/COMPLAINT SERVED ALLAN LEE HANES DBA ALLAN LEE HANES CONSTRUCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Filed (AMENDED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference (02/08/17 8:30AM A17 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIMM J. MICHAEL