This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 06:43:27 (UTC).

RAUL GUEVARA VS AMREP INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 RAUL GUEVARA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMREP INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9675

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA RAUL

Defendants

AMREP INC

PACCAR INC

DOES 1-30

Intervenor

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorneys

AYERS MICHAEL STEVEN

MORENO RICHARD CHARLES

Other Attorneys

LA CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF RO GIVE NOTICE

5/10/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF RO GIVE NOTICE

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/23/2013: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

5/23/2013: Unknown

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/23/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/7/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

6/19/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANT AMREP, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/14/2014: DEFENDANT AMREP, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DEFENDANT, AMREP, INC.'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/14/2014: DEFENDANT, AMREP, INC.'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. AYERS; DECLARATION OF ERIC L. M

3/14/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. AYERS; DECLARATION OF ERIC L. M

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/D1SCOVERY DATES]

5/7/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/D1SCOVERY DATES]

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF VALERIE R. VALADEZ

5/8/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF VALERIE R. VALADEZ

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMREP INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MUAMMAR REED IN SUPPORT THERE OF

5/14/2014: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMREP INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MUAMMAR REED IN SUPPORT THERE OF

PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED & UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/14/2014: PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED & UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DECLARATION OF MUAMMAR REED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/14/2014: DECLARATION OF MUAMMAR REED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AMREP, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

5/30/2014: AMREP, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DEFENDANT?S OBJECTIONS TO THE DOCUMENTS, STATEMENTS AND EVII)ENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/30/2014: DEFENDANT?S OBJECTIONS TO THE DOCUMENTS, STATEMENTS AND EVII)ENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

6/4/2014: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Minute Order

6/4/2014: Minute Order

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs ($8,167.49 (AMREP, INC.) COSTS ENTERED 08/20/15 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 08/20/15 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by AMREP INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/ DISMISSAL/OTHER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • at 10:00 am in Department LA92, Elia Weinbach, Presiding; Final Status Conference (PP) (TD 11-10-14) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by RAUL GUEVARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by RAUL GUEVARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Complaint; Filed by RAUL GUEVARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by RAUL GUEVARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMREP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Paccar, Inc. is a litigant