Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 14:23:16 (UTC).

RAQUEL VALDEZ VS SPORT CLIPS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 RAQUEL VALDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SPORT CLIPS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3917

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VALDEZ RAQUEL

Defendants and Respondents

BARE HARE INC

DOES 1-100

PELLEGRINO CARL

PELLEGRINO ROBIN

PINNACLE PEO CORPORATION

SPORT CLIPS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF DONALD A. HILLAND

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

POOLE DAVID S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY [CAL. GOV?T CODE ? 12940, 12920]; ETC

3/27/2013: COMPLAINT 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY [CAL. GOV?T CODE ? 12940, 12920]; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/9/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/10/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/10/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANTS? PINNACLE PEO CORPORATION; BARE HARE, INC.; CARL PELLEGRINO; AND ROBIN PELLEGRINO?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/21/2013: DEFENDANTS? PINNACLE PEO CORPORATION; BARE HARE, INC.; CARL PELLEGRINO; AND ROBIN PELLEGRINO?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF CMC

5/29/2013: NOTICE OF CMC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/29/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; PROOF OF SERVICE

6/5/2013: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; PROOF OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

6/5/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS:

6/10/2013: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS:

NOTICE OF CMC

6/17/2013: NOTICE OF CMC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/9/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/25/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/25/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

7/25/2013: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/3/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

9/9/2013: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/11/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W/ PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department 32, Mary H. Strobel, Presiding; Court Order - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 32, Mary H. Strobel, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other ( TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketOrder-Case Management; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF CMC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 32, Mary H. Strobel, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice (CCP 170.6 - PLTFF - DENIED ASUNTIMELY (CCP 170.6(A)(2)) - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF UNAVAILABILITY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice - Cause; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle PEO Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SC Quail Hill Inc; DBA : SPORT CLIPS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POOLE, DAVID S