Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 07:32:52 (UTC).

RAMONA LOPEZ CABRERA VS LIZANDRO SALAS, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2012 RAMONA LOPEZ CABRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIZANDRO SALAS, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, FREDERICK C. SHALLER and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2041

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CABRERA RAMONA LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL

RAMONA LOPEZ CABRERA

Defendants and Respondents

CHO JIN HEE AN INDIVIDUAL

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

SALAS LIZANDRO AN INDIVIDUAL

LIZANDRO SALAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BASH & POLYACHENKO P.C.

BASH & POLYACHENKO PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEE JESSIE SR ASSOCIATE COUNTY COUNSEL

BAEZA RUBEN JR. DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

MC CARTHY & BEAVERS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/22/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF?S LOSS OF WAGES OR LOSS OF EARNING CAPACITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JESSIE L

9/17/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF?S LOSS OF WAGES OR LOSS OF EARNING CAPACITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JESSIE L

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

10/3/2013: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

JOINT AGREED UPON REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

10/3/2013: JOINT AGREED UPON REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

JOINT WITNESS LIST

10/3/2013: JOINT WITNESS LIST

PI TRANSFER ORDER

10/22/2013: PI TRANSFER ORDER

Minute Order

10/22/2013: Minute Order

STIP AND ORDER

10/23/2013: STIP AND ORDER

Minute Order

10/24/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/25/2013: Minute Order

STIPULATION RE:JURY

10/28/2013: STIPULATION RE:JURY

Minute Order

10/28/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/29/2013: Minute Order

JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

10/29/2013: JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

Minute Order

10/31/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LIZANDRO SALAS TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS; ETC

12/3/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LIZANDRO SALAS TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS; ETC

DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LIZANDRO SALAS?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS; ETC

1/6/2014: DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LIZANDRO SALAS?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS; ETC

Minute Order

1/13/2014: Minute Order

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2014
  • Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Opposition Document (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFEN- DANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER M. POLY- HENKO; [PROPOSED] ORDER) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Motion to Tax Costs (MOTION OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LIZANDRO SALAS TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS; MEMOR- ANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JESSIE LEE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • Ntc Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs ($25,663.73 MEMO TO DEPT 46 12/06/13 MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS JAN 13, 2014 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Jury Instructions (JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Special Verdict Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • Motion in Limine (#1 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • Motion in Limine (#2 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2012
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JIN HEE CHO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO YOON CHO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO LIZANDRO SALAS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant