This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:54:49 (UTC).

RAMONA DUENAS VS JOSE MANUEL VILLA

Case Summary

On 06/18/2015 RAMONA DUENAS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE MANUEL VILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7721

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUENAS RAMONA

Defendants

STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS INC

VILLA JOSE MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ ANTONIO H. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Request for Court Judgment-Default; Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Dismissal of Does; Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by RAMONA DUENAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ ANTONIO H. ESQ.