This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:23:15 (UTC).

RAMON ROSALES SR ET AL VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 RAMON ROSALES SR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1815

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Guardian Ad Litems and Plaintiffs

ROSALES RAMON SR.

ROSALES SR. RAMON

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANS-

DOES 1 - 100

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSP.

SHAVER KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP

Cross Defendants

PETROSIAN SR ARON H.

PETROSIAN DIRUHI

Minors

ROSALES RAMON JR.

ROSALES ALEJANDRO J.

ROSALES ISAAC

ROSALES NICOLAS R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

DOURIAN ROBERT ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HURRELL THOMAS C. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

CULLINS & GRANDY

 

Court Documents

WRONGFUL DEATH & PERSONAL INJURY (1-3) GOV.T CODE ? 835, DANGEROUS & DEFECTIVE CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY & GOV.T CODE ? 815.2 NEGLIGENT OR WRONGFUL ACTS BY PUBLIC EMPLOYEES, RESULTING IN DANGEROUS

2/25/2016: WRONGFUL DEATH & PERSONAL INJURY (1-3) GOV.T CODE ? 835, DANGEROUS & DEFECTIVE CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY & GOV.T CODE ? 815.2 NEGLIGENT OR WRONGFUL ACTS BY PUBLIC EMPLOYEES, RESULTING IN DANGEROUS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?.CIVIL

2/25/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?.CIVIL

SUMMONS

3/11/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

7/21/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE

10/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

CROSS-DEFENDANT DIRUHI PETROSIAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (CCP437C); REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF HEATHER G. COTE; PROPOSED ORDER

2/7/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANT DIRUHI PETROSIAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (CCP437C); REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF HEATHER G. COTE; PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/23/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

2/23/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE RE CROSS-DEFENDANT DIRUHI PETROSIAN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AJUDICATION

4/11/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE RE CROSS-DEFENDANT DIRUHI PETROSIAN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AJUDICATION

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91,92,93,97)

5/15/2017: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91,92,93,97)

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES

5/19/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR STAY OF ALL DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ARON H. PETROSIAN, JR. AND THE DEPOSITION OF HAIK PETROSIAN, OR, IN THE ALTER

6/9/2017: ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR STAY OF ALL DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ARON H. PETROSIAN, JR. AND THE DEPOSITION OF HAIK PETROSIAN, OR, IN THE ALTER

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' AND DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS' OPPOSITION TO ARON PETROSIAN, JR.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY ON DISCOVERY

6/9/2017: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' AND DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS' OPPOSITION TO ARON PETROSIAN, JR.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY ON DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ETC.

6/13/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ETC.

Unknown

6/22/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

6/28/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON JUNE 28, 2017 CONTINUED HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY OF ALL DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO CROSS-DEFENDANT ARON H. PETROSIAN, JR. AND THE DEPOSITION OF HAIK

6/30/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON JUNE 28, 2017 CONTINUED HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY OF ALL DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO CROSS-DEFENDANT ARON H. PETROSIAN, JR. AND THE DEPOSITION OF HAIK

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 91; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 91; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR NICOLAS R ROSALES GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR ISAAC ROSALES GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ramon Rosales Sr. (Plaintiff); Ramon, Sr. Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM .CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR RAMON ROSALES,JR. GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC611815    Hearing Date: October 09, 2020    Dept: J

HEARING DATE: Friday, October 9, 2020

NOTICE: OK

RE: Rosales, et al. v. County of Los Angeles, et al. (BC611815; C/W Case No. BC611814)

______________________________________________________________________________

 

PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Responding Party: None (unopposed, as of 10/8/20, 9:16 a.m.)

Tentative Ruling

The Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Pending Action is GRANTED. Petitioner

and Claimant Ramon Rosales, Jr. are to be present at the time of the hearing, as per

California Rules of Court Rule 7.952.

Background

Case No. BC611814

Plaintiffs Ramon Rosales, Sr., Alejandro J. Rosales, Nicholas R. Rosales, Isaac Rosales and Rosales Jr., by and through their Guardian Ad Litem, Ramon Rosales Sr. (“Plaintiffs”) sue for injuries and for the wrongful death of their wife/mother, who was killed in a December 17, 2014 motor vehicle accident (“Subject Accident”). On February 25, 2016, Plaintiffs filed a complaint, asserting causes of action against Defendants Aron H. Petrosian Jr., Diruhi Petrosian, Aron H. Petrosian Sr. (collectively, “The Petrosians”) and Does 1-100 for:

  1. Negligent/Reckless Operation of Motor Vehicle Resulting in Wrongful Death and Personal Injury;

  2. Negligent/Reckless Entrustment of Motor Vehicle to Minor Resulting in Wrongful Death and Personal Injury

    On July 25, 2017, this case was ordered transferred to this instant department, at the direction of Department 1. On September 11, 2017, this case was consolidated with Case No. BC611815 for all proceedings.

    On May 1, 2020, the court granted The Petrosians’ motion for determination of good faith settlement. On July 22, 2020, an “Order Re Tolling of 5-Year Statute” was filed.

    The Final Status Conference is set for August 23, 2021. Trial is set for August 31, 2021.

    Case No. BC611815

    Plaintiffs Ramon Rosales, Sr., Alejandro J. Rosales, Nicholas R. Rosales, Isaac Rosales and Rosales Jr., by and through their Guardian Ad Litem, Ramon Rosales Sr. (“Plaintiffs”) allege that a roadway design defect and unsafe roadway conditions caused/contributed to the Subject Accident. On February 25, 2016, Plaintiffs filed a complaint, asserting causes of action against Defendants County of Los Angeles (County”), Department of Public Works (“Public Works”), State of California Department of Transportation (“DOT”) and Does 1-100 for:

    1-3. Gov’t Code § 835, Dangerous & Defective Condition of Public Property

    & Gov’t Code § 815.2 Negligent or Wrongful Acts by Public

    Employees, Resulting in Dangerous Road Conditions

    4-6. Negligence/Wrongful Conduct of Non-Public Entity Third Parties

    Causing Dangerous Condition of Public Property

    On August 4, 2016, County and Public Works filed their cross-complaint, wherein they asserted causes of action against Cross-Defendants The Petrosians and Does 1-50 for:

  1. Equitable Indemnity

  2. Contribution

  3. Comparative Fault

    On September 29, 2016, Plaintiffs dismissed DOT, without prejudice. On July 25, 2017, this case was ordered transferred to this instant department, at the direction of Department 1. On September 11, 2017, this case was consolidated with Case No. BC611815 for all proceedings.

Discussion

Petitioner Ramon Rosales, Sr. as Guardian ad Litem for Ramon Rosales, Jr. (“Petitioner”) moves for approval of the disposition of proceeds of judgment for the Claimant Ramon Rosales, Jr. (“Claimant”).

The court has reviewed the petition and finds the settlement to be fair and reasonable. Petitioner refers to the Petition for Minor’s Compromise in Case No. BC611814, which was approved by the court on August 11, 2020, regarding copies of the relevant medical records, and advises that the prior court approved settlement resolved any relevant pending liens against Claimant’s recovery. Petitioner has submitted an itemization of costs and a copy of the retainer agreement. Counsel’s declaration is sufficient to support the fees requested.

The court is inclined to grant the petition. Petitioner and Claimant Ramon Rosales, Jr. are to be present at the time of the hearing, as per California Rules of Court Rule 7.952.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHAVER KORFF CASTRONOVO LLP is a litigant