This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 11:21:25 (UTC).

RAMIN R. YOUNESSI, ER AL., VS LUXE SUNSET BOULEVARD HOTEL,

Case Summary

On 02/26/2015 RAMIN R YOUNESSI, ER AL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUXE SUNSET BOULEVARD HOTEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY L. NEWMAN and MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3841

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NANCY L. NEWMAN

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI APLC

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

LAW OFFICEOF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ISLAM KHALID

SPECTRUM TOWELS AND LINENS INC.

MILE HI VALET SERVICE INC.

E.H. SUMMIT INC.

TOWNS HOLDINGS INC.

E.H. SUMMIT INC. DBA LUXE SUNSET

TOWNE PARK

LUXE SUNSET BOULVEVARD HOTEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ISLAM KHALID

SPECTRUM TOWELS AND LINENS INC.

Cross Defendants

LUXE SUNSET BOULEVARD HOTEL

E.H. SUMMIT INC. DBA LUXE SUNSET

ROES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI

BUCKLIN STEPHEN L.

SCHULMAN ALLISON M.

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BROWN NERI & AMITH

POSTER SARA B.

KHAN AMJAD M.

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

COZEN O'CONNOR

MACKEY ROBERT T.

WORGUL JOHN

SHIMKIN DAVID A.

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKE

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/8/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/2/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING 7/31/15 HEARING DATE)

7/22/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING 7/31/15 HEARING DATE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/18/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

7/31/2015: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER

6/2/2015: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL

1/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/2/2015: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/15/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

2/26/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/19/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/4/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT E.H.SUMMIT, INC., DBA LUXE SUNSET BOULEVARD.HOTEL'S NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

9/15/2015: DEFENDANT E.H.SUMMIT, INC., DBA LUXE SUNSET BOULEVARD.HOTEL'S NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

SUMMONS

2/26/2015: SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/2/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Plaintiff); Law Officeof Ramin R. Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Notice-Settlement (conditional ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Former Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Law Offices of Ramin R. Younessi, APLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Law Offices of Ramin R. Younessi, APLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Plaintiff); Law Officeof Ramin R. Younessi (Plaintiff); Law Offices of Ramin R. Younessi, APLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.