This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 06:12:47 (UTC).

RAM SAXENA VS BANK OF AMERICA N A

Case Summary

On 01/04/2012 RAM SAXENA filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA N A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and JOSH M. FREDRICKS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6284

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

JOSH M. FREDRICKS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAXENA RAM

Defendants and Respondents

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

DOES 1 TO 50

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

GREENTREE SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SEVERSON & WERSON A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

1/4/2012: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

Unknown

1/4/2012: Unknown

Proof of Service

2/27/2012: Proof of Service

Unknown

3/29/2012: Unknown

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

4/3/2012: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDAN?F BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

5/1/2012: NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDAN?F BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

IPOT1 JUDGMENT FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF 1)EMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/4/2012: IPOT1 JUDGMENT FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF 1)EMURRER TO COMPLAINT

II ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

6/4/2012: II ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

6/12/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/12/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/7/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

8/14/2015: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order

8/19/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING RELATING AND/OR CONSOLIDATING CASE NUMBER BC567931 TO CASE NUMBER BC476284

8/26/2015: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING RELATING AND/OR CONSOLIDATING CASE NUMBER BC567931 TO CASE NUMBER BC476284

Minute Order

9/9/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 9, 2015 MINUTE ORDER

9/15/2015: NOTICE OF THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 9, 2015 MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/9/2015: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

11/6/2015: Proof of Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2015
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Notice (OF THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 9, 2015 MINUTE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING RELATING AND/OR CONSOLIDATING BC567931 WITH BC476284 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Notice-Related Cases (BC567931 DEPT. 50 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Judgment (FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Order (SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTI WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Reply/Response (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2012
  • Notice (OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ORIGINAL

SANFORD P. SHATZ (State Bar No. 127229) sps@severson.com

| ANDREW A. WOOD (State Bar No. 279403) Fi aaw(@severson.com SUP ERIOR €O % E B SEVERSON & WERSON YOFL @Jg A Professional Corporation JU "ELES The Atrium NO 6/ 2017 19100 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 700 N A, Gl Exne [rvine, California 92612 " e ) , .,"’V@ Ormioel/Glarge

Telephone: (949) 442-7110 S e Facsimile: (949) 442-7118 RARRTE == Degys

MARK JOSEPH KENNEY (State Bar No. 87345)

SEVERSON & WERSON

A Professional Corporation

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, California 94111

Telephone: (415) 398-3344

Facsimile: (415) 956-0439

Attorneys for Defendant BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL DISTRICT

Ram Saxena, an Individual, Case No. BC476284 . Hon. Michael L. Stern Plaintiff, Dept. 62 VS. [P-R%SEB] JUDGMENT FOLLOWING

SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO

Bank of America, N.A.; and DOES | TO 50, COMPLAINT

Defendants. Date: May 10, 2012 Time: 8:30a.m. Dept.: 62

Action Filed: January 4, 2012

IT APPEARING FROM the files and records in the above-entitled action, that concurrently with the entry of this judgment, the Court entered an Order Sustaining Defendant Bank of America, N.A.’s Demurrer to Plaintiff Ram Saxena’s Complaint in its entirety without

leave to amend, and

GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREFOR,