This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2020 at 00:08:54 (UTC).

RALPH HABER ET AL VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ET A

Case Summary

On 06/22/2015 RALPH HABER filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5858

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CARKEET BRIAN

CARKEET NOPARRAT

HABER LYN

HABER RALPH

HESS LINDA

O'DELL DANIEL

WILCHER SUSAN

STATE FARM GENERAL INS CO BC608001

CHRISTENSON CHRIS BC607531

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOC/BC608363

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT CO.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

UTILITY TREE SERVICE INC.

THE ORIGINAL MOWBRAY'S TREE SERVICES INC

THE ORIGINAL MOWBRAY'S TREE SERVICE INC.

UTILITY TREE SERVICE INC. DIMISSED

TALBOT LAURA

TALBOT THOMAS

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK

SCHROEDER LOSCOTOFF LLP

SIMON CRAIG S. ESQ. BC609549

SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER C.

BENJAMIN MEDIA

REGAN THOMAS M. BC611086

FRANTZ LAW GROUP BC615033 & BC607531

OCHOA MAURA WALSH BC608001

CAINE SHAWN E. ESQ. BC608363

BRANSON BENJAMIN BC608411

ROYE KENNETH BC648862BC692095

LOEWE A. SCOTT

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

GIMPLE RANDY W.

JACOBS DOUGLAS E.

MORGENSTERN ROBERT A. ESQ

SOLOMON ESKEL H. ESQ. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

WILGUS DAVID S.

SEITZ FRIEDRICH W. ESQ.

GEIBEL MICHAEL B. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MORGENSTERN ROBERT A. ESQ

SOLOMON ESKEL H. ESQ. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

WILGUS DAVID S.

Cross Defendant Attorney

FINN RICHARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES ETC.

11/30/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES ETC.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

12/19/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order -

12/19/2017: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF RE TRIAL STRUCTURE

12/29/2017: PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF RE TRIAL STRUCTURE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND FAX NUMBER FOR BERGER KAHN

12/29/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND FAX NUMBER FOR BERGER KAHN

Minute Order -

1/5/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

1/5/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

572 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles Department of Water (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles Department of Water (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 01/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of Los Angeles Department of Water (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by The Original Mowbray's Tree Service, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,279 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Ralph Haber (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) INVERSE CONDEMNATION (AS TO DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ralph Haber (Plaintiff); Lyn Haber (Plaintiff); Brian Carkeet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UTILITY TREE SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ORIGINAL MOWBRAY'S TREE SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant