Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 04:59:34 (UTC).

RALPH GONZALEZ VS MARSHALLS OF CA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/07/2013 RALPH GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MARSHALLS OF CA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2415

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GONZALEZ RALPH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

GUENTHER DOUG

MARSHALLS OF CA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AEGIS LAW FIRM PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

IRADJPANAH K. KAYVAN

LITTLER MENDELSON P.C.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

3/7/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RACE DISCRIMINATION; ETC

3/7/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RACE DISCRIMINATION; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/9/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT DOUG GUENTHER?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

5/15/2013: DEFENDANT DOUG GUENTHER?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/7/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/10/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/13/2013: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/13/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

6/24/2013: Minute Order -

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

6/24/2013: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/5/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

9/9/2013: Minute Order -

STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF MEDIAT[ON CUT-OFF DATE AND JOINT POST-MEDIATION STATUS REPORT, AND [P] ORDER

9/9/2013: STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF MEDIAT[ON CUT-OFF DATE AND JOINT POST-MEDIATION STATUS REPORT, AND [P] ORDER

Minute Order -

9/9/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF COURT?S ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION CUT OFF

9/11/2013: NOTICE OF COURT?S ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION CUT OFF

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

10/28/2013: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE CIVIL

1/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE CIVIL

POST-MEDIATION JOINT STATUS REPORT

1/3/2014: POST-MEDIATION JOINT STATUS REPORT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 47, Debre K. Weintraub, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketReport-Joint Status-VELS (POST MEDIATION ); Filed by Joined Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketOrder-Protective; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Docketin Department 41, Debre K. Weintraub, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE CONTINUANCE OF MEDIATION CUT OFF DATE AND JOINT POST MEDATION STATUS REPORT; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketReceipt (FIRST APPEARANCE FEE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2013
  • DocketOrder (TRIAL PEPARATION ORDER ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketReceipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (Marshalls of CA, LLC & Doug Guenth er ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketProof-Personal Service (Summons & Complaint, etc. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARSHALLS OF CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IRADJPANAH K. KAYVAN