This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:29:36 (UTC).

RAFAEL GOMEZ VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATI

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 RAFAEL GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2062

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOMEZ RAFAEL

Defendants and Respondents

METROLINK

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REGIONAL RAIL

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORT

DOES 1 TO 50

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REGIONAL RAIL AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EMRANI JACOB ESQ.

EMRANI JACOB

Defendant Attorney

WEND CHRISTOPHER P

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

11/30/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ETC.

1/27/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ETC.

1/27/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION O

1/27/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION O

Minute Order

3/28/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

6/9/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO), NOS. 56 AND 57, PROPOUNDED ON BEHALF OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTA

7/10/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO), NOS. 56 AND 57, PROPOUNDED ON BEHALF OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTA

NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR LACMTA'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO), NOS. 56 AND 57

7/28/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR LACMTA'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTION, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO), NOS. 56 AND 57

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOT1ON/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

12/28/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOT1ON/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL STATUTORY DATES

5/16/2018: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL STATUTORY DATES

Notice of Settlement

10/9/2018: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

10/11/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/25/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/7/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

4/24/2019: Minute Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Rafael Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 10/25/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order ((Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rafael Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rafael Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rafael Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Rafael Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Rafael Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC632062    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 4A

Motion to Set Aside Dismissal Pursuant to C.C.P. §473(b)

Having considered the moving, opposing, and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On August 29, 2016, Plaintiff Rafael Gomez (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metrolink, Southern California Regional Rail Authority, and DOES 1 to 50, asserting a cause of action for motor vehicle.

On October 26, 2016, Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority dba Metro (“Defendant”) filed an answer to the complaint.

On October 28, 2016, Plaintiff filed a Request for Dismissal, dismissing Defendants Metrolink and Southern California Regional Rail Authority.

On October 9, 2018, Defendant filed a Notice of Settlement of Entire Action.

On July 29, 2019, the Court dismissed Plaintiff’s complaint with prejudice.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff moves for an order setting aside dismissal of the instant action.

LEGAL STANDARD

C.C.P. §473(b) provides, in pertinent part, as follows:

…Notwithstanding any other requirements of this section, the court shall, whenever an application for relief is made no more than six months after entry of judgment, is in proper form, and is accompanied by an attorney’s sworn affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect, vacate any (1) resulting default entered by the clerk against his or her client, and which will result in entry of a default judgment, or (2) resulting default judgment or dismissal entered against his or her client, unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect…

Under C.C.P. §473(b)’s attorney affidavit provision set forth above, “a party is relieved from the consequences of his or her attorney's mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect. Relief is available regardless of whether the attorney's neglect is excusable. [Citations] Moreover, if the requirements of this provision are met, then relief is mandatory. [Citations]” (Lorenz v. Commercial Acceptance Insurance Company (1995) 40 Cal.App.4th 981, 989.)

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff Rafael Gomez (“Plaintiff”) moves for an order setting aside dismissal of the instant action, pursuant to C.C.P. §473(b).

On July 29, 2019, the court dismissed the instant action with prejudice after Plaintiff failed to appear for the OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement. (Court’s 7/29/19 Minute Order.)

Relief from dismissal is mandatory under C.C.P. §473(b). Plaintiff filed the instant motion on September 20, 2019, less than two months after dismissal of the action. Plaintiff’s motion is accompanied by an attorney affidavit of fault. Plaintiff’s counsel, Allan Dollison, declared “Plaintiff’s counsel’s office failed to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing on July 29, 2019 due to an internal office calendaring issue and no hearing date was placed on the office calendar. As a result, Plaintiff’s counsel’s office did not appear at the OSC hearing of July 29, 2019 and the court dismissed the case with prejudice.” (Declaration of Dollison ¶12.) Dollison declared that, due to the calendaring error, the July 29, 2019 hearing was not put on the calendar, “the handling attorney was unaware of the scheduled hearing date, and on July 29, 2019, no appearance was made by Plaintiff’s counsel.” (Declaration of Dollison ¶13.)

In opposition, Defendant appears to argue the dismissal should not be set aside because the matter settled over a year ago and Plaintiff has not signed the settlement documents. However, the issue before the Court is whether the dismissal should be set aside. As discussed above, relief from dismissal is mandatory.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s motion to set aside the dismissal entered on July 29, 2019 is GRANTED.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of the Court’s ruling.