This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 17:54:04 (UTC).

RACHEL SHAPIRO ET AL VS LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/23/2010 RACHEL SHAPIRO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ZAVEN V. SINANIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6379

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ZAVEN V. SINANIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAPIRO RACHEL

Defendants

AVERILL JANET B.

BARBER DARIN W.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

EVERT CLAUDIA

HOWELL PATRICIA A.

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT SCHOOL BOARD

NAJERA JAMES A.

ROGERS GAIL

SCHAMBECK FRED W.

SHAW MARY

Guardian Ad Litem

SHAPIRO KAREN

Not Classified By Court

FLIEDER NAOMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACY CARY S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lowell Joint School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • DocketJOINT APPLICATION TO AMEND ORDER APPROVING PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF THE PENDING CLAIM OF RACHEL SHAPIRO NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department 23; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketOrd-Deposit Minor's Funds; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketOrd-Approving Compromise; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMC1V1L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION -APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM -CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) BATTERY; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.