This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2016 at 23:50:14 (UTC).

RAAM CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS SMART SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2011 RAAM CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SMART SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. MILTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5718

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. MILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAAM CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

SMART SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINBORG & MAZOR LLP

Defendant Attorney

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Notice (OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Notice of Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DEFENDANTS' DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES FOR TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Amended Notice (OF RULING ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Objection (TO SMART SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES NOTICE OF RULING ON ITS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DOC PROD ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Declaration (OF PATRICIA I. FORMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF THE OBJECTION TO SMART SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES, INC'S NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DOC PRODUCTION ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • Summons Filed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAAM CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant