This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2015 at 00:04:41 (UTC).

QUARTZ HILL CARES V. CITY OF LANCASTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/26/2009 QUARTZ HILL CARES filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF LANCASTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TORRIBIO, JOHN A. and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2336

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUARTZ HILL CARES

Defendants

CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF LANCASTER

CITY OF LANCASTER

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

DOES 11 THROUGH 25

LANCASTER CITY OF

LANCASTER WEST 60TH LLC

MANATT PHELPS & PHILLIPS LLP

MANATT PHELPS PHILLIPS

WAL-MART STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCLENDON JOHN G.

VAN BLARCOM LEIBOLD MCCLENDON & MANN

Defendant Attorney

STRADLING YOCCA CARLSON & RAUTH

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE NOTE TO COURT CLERK: THIS PETITION INCLUDES A CALIFORNIA ENVIRONMENT QUALITY ACT; ETC.

8/26/2009: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE NOTE TO COURT CLERK: THIS PETITION INCLUDES A CALIFORNIA ENVIRONMENT QUALITY ACT; ETC.

REQUEST TO PREPARE RECORD OF PRCEEDINGS

8/26/2009: REQUEST TO PREPARE RECORD OF PRCEEDINGS

Minute Order

9/23/2009: Minute Order

NOTIFICATION OF THE ESTIMATED COSTS OF PREPARATION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

9/29/2009: NOTIFICATION OF THE ESTIMATED COSTS OF PREPARATION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEAL

10/1/2010: NOTICE OF APPEAL

APPELLANTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

10/1/2010: APPELLANTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

10/8/2010: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

11/24/2010: NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL

3/28/2013: NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

4/10/2013: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

APPELLANTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

6/5/2013: APPELLANTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

-NOTICE OF APPEALJCROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE)

8/21/2013: -NOTICE OF APPEALJCROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE)

NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

8/22/2013: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

9/3/2013: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2015
  • Judgment (AFTER SECOND APPEAL ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs (ON APPEAL ) Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Notice of Appeal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR AWARD OF STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER DISCHARGING THE PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE ) Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF COURTS ORDER ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR AWARD OF STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Order (GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF STATUTORY ATTORNEYS' FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Order (COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION FOR AWARD OF STATUTORY ATTORNEYS' FEES ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • Order (DISCHARGING THE PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (INDEX OF DOCUMENTS PROPOSED TO CONSTITUTE THE ADMIN. RECORD AND SUPPLEMENTAL ESTIMATED COST OF PREPARATION ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR HEARING UNDER PUBLIC RESOURCES CODE SECTION 21167.4(A) AND GOVT CODE SECTION 65753(A) ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (notification of the estimated cost of preparation of the administrative record ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (NOTIFICATION OF THE ESTIMATED COST OF PREPARATION OF THE ADMIN. RECORD ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • Petition (FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CEQA RE-ASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST TO PREPARE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Complaint Filed (VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY LANCASTER is a litigant

Latest cases where LANCASTER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LANCASTER is a litigant

Latest cases where M.A.N., Inc is a litigant