This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 03:12:19 (UTC).

QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL INC VS AMG ASSOCIATES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/26/2011 QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMG ASSOCIATES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8495

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL INC.

Defendants

AMG ASSOCIATES INC.

DOES 1-300

LONG BEACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

PACIFIC CLINICS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PRO-

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINE BERNARD S.

Defendant Attorney

LASNIK LARRY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

8/26/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT (BREACH OF CONTRACT, COMMON COUNTS, ENFORCEMENT OF STOP NOTICES, AND ENFORCEMENT OF PAYMENT BONDS)

8/26/2011: COMPLAINT (BREACH OF CONTRACT, COMMON COUNTS, ENFORCEMENT OF STOP NOTICES, AND ENFORCEMENT OF PAYMENT BONDS)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/2/2011: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/8/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/8/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/12/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/14/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF SE1TLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/21/2011: NOTICE OF SE1TLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

9/22/2011: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order -

9/26/2011: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/30/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

ANSWER OF LONG BEACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT TO COMPLAINT OF QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.

10/3/2011: ANSWER OF LONG BEACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT TO COMPLAINT OF QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

10/7/2011: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; MINUTE ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL

10/7/2011: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; MINUTE ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; MINUTE ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND OSC RE: DISM

10/11/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; MINUTE ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND OSC RE: DISM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; MINUTE ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Quality Environmental, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; MINUTE ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Quality Environmental, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Quality Environmental, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Quality Environmental, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (BREACH OF CONTRACT, COMMON COUNTS, ENFORCEMENT OF STOP NOTICES, AND ENFORCEMENT OF PAYMENT BONDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Quality Environmental, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG is a litigant

Latest cases where QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Long Beach Community College District is a litigant

Latest cases where AMG & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant