This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 00:22:43 (UTC).

QDOS INC VS FAZLIQ DEAN KADER ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2014 QDOS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FAZLIQ DEAN KADER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6521

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DESKSITE

QDOS INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

AUTO GALLERY THE

DOES 1 THROUGH 90

KADER FAZLIQ DEAN

MOTORCARS WEST LLC

SIGNATURE FINANCIAL LLC [DOE 63]

PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC [DOE 62]

THE AUTO GALLERY

RICK JENKINS M.D. INC. [DOE 61]

GILLAM RICHARD

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

MOTORCARS WEST LLC

SIGNATURE FINANCIAL LLC [DOE 63]

PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC [DOE 62]

RICK JENKINS M.D. INC. [DOE 61]

Not Classified By Court

KATAMAYA MIE

KATAYAMA MIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF DAMIAN D. CAPOZZOLA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KOLAR & ASOCIATES

KOLAR ELIZABETH L. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

TURNER & MODARELLI PC

RUNGE BENJAMIN THOMAS

LAQUER TIMOTHY ROY

 

Court Documents

Declaration

3/15/2019: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

4/2/2019: Notice of Ruling

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

12/15/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

4/8/2015: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STR1KE AND MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT: MEMORANDUM. IN SUPPORT THER

7/17/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STR1KE AND MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT: MEMORANDUM. IN SUPPORT THER

ANSWER OF RICK JENKINS, M.D., INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/1/2015: ANSWER OF RICK JENKINS, M.D., INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT THE AUTO GALLERY'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE AUTO GALLERY'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/11/2015: DEFENDANT THE AUTO GALLERY'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE AUTO GALLERY'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/18/2015: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/18/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/23/2015: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order

3/24/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF QDOS, INC. DBA DESKSITE'S STATEMENT OF THE CASE

5/25/2016: PLAINTIFF QDOS, INC. DBA DESKSITE'S STATEMENT OF THE CASE

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

12/13/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order

1/17/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/14/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DEBTOR NON-APPEARANCE AND CONTINUED JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION HEARING

4/17/2017: NOTICE OF DEBTOR NON-APPEARANCE AND CONTINUED JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION HEARING

Minute Order

10/19/2017: Minute Order

245 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by QDOS, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Court's order on motion to tax costs on appeal (denied); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 09:01 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Reply ( to Opposition); Filed by QDOS, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by QDOS, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Opposition (DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS ON APPEAL); Filed by Motorcars West, LLC (Legacy Party); Premier Financial Services, LLC [DOE 62] (Legacy Party); Rick Jenkins M.D., Inc. [DOE 61] (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration); Filed by Motorcars West, LLC (Legacy Party); Premier Financial Services, LLC [DOE 62] (Legacy Party); Rick Jenkins M.D., Inc. [DOE 61] (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
485 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by QDOS, Inc. (Plaintiff); DeskSite (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QDOS, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTO GALLERY THE is a litigant

Latest cases where SIGNATURE FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTORCARS WEST LLC DBA THE AUTO GALLERY is a litigant