This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2016 at 03:08:52 (UTC).

PUENTE HILLS BUSINESS CENTER VS EMILY AUYANG PERDREAUVILLE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 PUENTE HILLS BUSINESS CENTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMILY AUYANG PERDREAUVILLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OKI, DAN THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3689

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OKI, DAN THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUENTE HILLS BUSINESS CENTER II L.P.

Defendant

PERDREAUVILLE EMILY AUYANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ STUART

SEIDE RICHARD L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2014
  • Writ-Other (ISSUED TO LA CO ) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Filed Writ of Exec (WRIT ISSUED 6/04/13 TO LA CO FILED AND RETURNED: SURRENDERRED/UNUSED ) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Cost Bill after Judgmt(685.070ccp) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Proof of Service (RE ORAP AS TO: CHARLES PERDREAUVIL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Proof of Service (RE ORAP AS TO: EMILY PERDREAUVILLE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Appl for Writ of Execution & Order Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Cost Bill after Judgmt(685.070ccp) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Writ-Other (ISSUED TO LA CO ) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Application - misc Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2009
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (does 1 to 10 only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • Request for Court Judgment-Default Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • Notice (of OSC Re Default Judgment ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • Default Entered (COURT JUDGMENT SENT TO DEPT J W/OUT FILE (FILE IN DEPT) 2-9-09 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.