This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:37:45 (UTC).

PUDDINGSTONE LA VENTURE LLC VS JEFF JONES

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 PUDDINGSTONE LA VENTURE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JEFF JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8748

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

PUDDINGSTONE LA VENTURE LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JONES MARISA

JONES JEFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAMER JEFFREY STEVEN

SUTTON CHARLES ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

HARTNETT PATRICK MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

SUTTON CHARLES R.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/23/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

9/23/2016: Summons

Complaint

9/23/2016: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2016: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

10/11/2016: Unknown

Unknown

10/11/2016: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/11/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/11/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

11/1/2016: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/1/2016: Cross-Complaint

Summons

11/1/2016: Summons

Answer

11/1/2016: Answer

Unknown

11/7/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/7/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/15/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/18/2016: Unknown

Unknown

12/7/2016: Unknown

Case Management Statement

2/7/2017: Case Management Statement

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Written Settlement Agreement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Written Settlement Agreement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Written Settlement Agreement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Written Set...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (To continue Order to Show Cause/Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Jeff Jones (Defendant); Marisa Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Jeff Jones (Defendant); Marisa Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC068748    Hearing Date: May 4, 2021    Dept: J

HEARING DATE: Tuesday, May 4, 2021

NOTICE: OK

RE: Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC v. Jones (KC068748)

______________________________________________________________________________

 

Counsel for Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC’s (i.e., Kramer, DeBoer & Keane) MOTION

TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Responding Party: None (unopposed, as of 4/22/21, 8:24 a.m.; due 4/21/21)

Tentative Ruling

Counsel for Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC’s (i.e., Kramer, DeBoer & Keane) Motion to

Be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED, effective upon the filing of the proof of service

showing service of the signed order upon the Client at the Client’s last known address. An Order to Show Cause Re: Representation of LLC is set for May 25, 2021 at 8:30 a.m.

Background

This is an action to settle a property line dispute between adjoining landowners. On September 23, 2016, Plaintiff Puddingstone LA Venture, LLC (“Plaintiff”) filed its complaint against Defendants Jeff Jones, Marisa Jones (“M. Jones”) and Does 1-100, asserting causes of action against them for:

  1. Declaratory Relief

  2. Ejectment

    On November 7, 2016, M. Jones filed her First Amended Cross-Complaint (“FACC”), asserting causes of action against Plaintiff, All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint, Adverse to Cross-Complainant’s Title or Any Cloud on Cross-Complainant’s Title Thereto and Does 1-100 for:

  1. Quiet Title to Appurtenant Easement

  2. Declaratory Relief

  3. Injunctive Relief—Preliminary & Permanent Injunctions

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is set for August 6, 2021.

Discussion

Kramer, DeBoer & Keane (“Firm”) seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff (“Client”).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of

justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915; People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398.)

California Rule of Court (“CRC”) Rule 3.1362 requires (1) a notice of motion and motion directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure § 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) a proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)). The court may delay the effective date of the order relieving counsel until proof of service of a copy of the signed order on the client has been filed with the court.

Attorney Mark C. Phillips (“Phillips”) of Firm states in his declaration as follows: “There are irreconci[l]able differences between our law firm and client that prevent our law firm from representing our client properly. I have asked the client to sign and return a Substitution of Attorney form. But that has not happened, thereby causing the need for this motion.”

Phillips states that he has served the Client by mail at the Client’s last known address with copies of the motion papers served with his declaration, and that he has confirmed, within the past 30 days, that the address is current, via verification through the California Secretary of State website business search.

The court determines that the requirements of Rules of Court Rule 3.1362 enumerated above

have been sufficiently met.

Accordingly, the motion is granted, effective upon the filing of the proof of service reflecting

service of the signed order upon the Client at the Client’s last known address.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Representation of LLC is set for May 25, 2021 at 8:30 a.m.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUTTON CHARLES ROBERT