This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 17:33:35 (UTC).

PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. VS RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 03/25/2015 PROPERTY CASUALTY INS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAINBOWS PAINTING CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK J. JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2787

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK J. JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. OF HART

Defendant

RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGER WILLIAM KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

LUBIN LEE DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2016
  • at 10:00 AM in Department T; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department NWT, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; Conference-Final Status (FSC : TRIAL DATE 2/2/16) - Off calendar-Case dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Request-Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • (Request-Dismissal); Filed by PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. OF HART (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department NWT, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Held-Trial date set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. OF HART (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2015
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Answer; Filed by RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. OF HART (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Answer (TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Summons-Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. OF HART (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartfor is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBIN LEE DAVID