This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 11:49:04 (UTC).

PROLIEN SERVICES, LLC VS. ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2015 PROLIEN SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK J. JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2699

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK J. JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PETERSON JARED

JARED PETERSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; (OSC-Dismissal; Dismissal-Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department NWT, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; OSC-Dismissal (OSC DISMISSAL FAILURE TO PERFECTDEFAULT JUDGMENTcont. 2x) - Dismissal-Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Prolien Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Request-Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • (name extension) (Request-Dismissal); Filed by Prolien Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department NWT, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; OSC-Dismissal (OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TOPERFECT DEFAULT JUDGMENTcont. 2x) - Held-Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Declaration (OF KEVIN BUCHANAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585) ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Declaration (OF JARED PETERSON RE INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2015
  • Declaration (OF NON-SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Prolien Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Declaration (OF NON-SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Prolien Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Prolien Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Prolien Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less