This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 05:23:20 (UTC).

PRO-T USA INC VS C & H SPORTSWEAR INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/11/2014 PRO-T USA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C H SPORTSWEAR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6486

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRO-T USA INC.

Defendants and Respondents

C & H SPORTSWEAR INC.

CUEVA ADAM

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAENAM COE PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FUENTES RUBEN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

12/11/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

12/11/2014: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ETC.

3/12/2015: APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ETC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

3/12/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Unknown

3/16/2015: Unknown

Unknown

3/27/2015: Unknown

Minute Order

6/8/2015: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

6/19/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DE FENDANT ADAM CUE VA , C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

7/17/2015: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DE FENDANT ADAM CUE VA , C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

NOTICE OF RULIN G

7/31/2015: NOTICE OF RULIN G

NOTICE OF RULING AND ENTRY OF ORDER THERON RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

10/7/2015: NOTICE OF RULING AND ENTRY OF ORDER THERON RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' EXHIBIT LIST

3/7/2016: DEFENDANTS' EXHIBIT LIST

LIST OF WITNESS WITH TIME ESTIMATE

3/10/2016: LIST OF WITNESS WITH TIME ESTIMATE

PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF EXHIBITS

3/10/2016: PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF EXHIBITS

Minute Order

3/11/2016: Minute Order

STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT

3/11/2016: STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/22/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2016
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Stipulation (SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (LIST OF CACI INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Brief (TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice (TO ATTEND TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Summons Filed (ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2015
  • Order (TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Points and Authorities Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Appl/Ntc for Rt to Attach & Order Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Appl for Attach/Temp Protect Order Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons (P/S C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C&H SPORTSWEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUENTES RUBEN