This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 09:23:12 (UTC).

PRIME HEALTHCARE CASES

Case Summary

On 05/20/2009 PRIME HEALTHCARE CASES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER D. LICHTMAN, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, JANE JOHNSON, ANN I. JONES, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and CARL J. WEST. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4580

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PETER D. LICHTMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

JANE JOHNSON

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

CARL J. WEST

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES SAN DIMAS LLC

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICE II LLC.

PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA [BS162809]

DESERT VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL INC.

PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH LLC

VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES INC.

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO LLC

PRIME HEALTHCARE CENTINELA LLC.

Respondents and Defendants

MONTCLAIR EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSO.(DOE 14)

CHINO EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSO. (DOE 3)

ORANGE COUNTY EMERGENCY MEDICAL

CHINO EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSO. (DOE 11)

KAISER FOUND. HEALTH PLAN INC. [800317]

KAISER FOUND. HEALTH PLAN INC. [800590]

KAISER FOUND. HEALTH PLAN INC. [068370]

ALVARADO EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSO.(DOE 8)

DR. PREM REDDY

PACIFICA EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSO. (DOE 15)

Cross Defendant

EMERGENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES [DOE 1]

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ISAACS FRIEDBERG & LABATON LLP

GREINES MARTIN STEIN & RICHLAND LLP

KING & SPALDING

SCHELL TROY A. ESQ.

MICHAEL J. SARRAO ESQ.

GLASSER WEIL FINK JACOBS ET AL

MCDONOUGH HOLLAND & ALLEN PC

DLA PIPER LLP (US)

NELSON HARDIMANN LLP

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

EPSTEIN BECKER & GREEN P.C.

CROWELL & MORING LLP

EPPS YONG & COULSON LLP

BIRD MARELLA BOXER WOLPERT NESSSIM

MARION'S INN LLP

MANATT PHELPS & PHILLIPS LLP

NOWICKI KEVIN R.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GREINES MARTIN STEIN & RICHLAND LLP

NELSON HARDIMANN LLP

SELESNICK ANDREW H. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B296487

11/19/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B296487

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 08/05/16

8/5/2016: Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 08/05/16

Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 09/16/16 COUNTY CLERK

9/16/2016: Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 09/16/16 COUNTY CLERK

Stipulation and Order - BC390969-STIPULATION AND ORDER ADDING ON CASES TO COORDINATED CASE NO. JCCP 4580, STAYING 4-0 PROCEEDINGS IN DEPTS. 16 AND 6,9; DESIGNATING CASES AS COMPLEX, AND DESIGNATING CO

9/16/2016: Stipulation and Order - BC390969-STIPULATION AND ORDER ADDING ON CASES TO COORDINATED CASE NO. JCCP 4580, STAYING 4-0 PROCEEDINGS IN DEPTS. 16 AND 6,9; DESIGNATING CASES AS COMPLEX, AND DESIGNATING CO

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/16/2016: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Case Management Statement - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

11/30/2016: Case Management Statement - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order -

12/2/2016: Minute Order -

Motion to Seal - BS162807-NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL

12/15/2016: Motion to Seal - BS162807-NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER STAYING PETITION PROCEEDINGS PENDING CONCLUSION OF ARBITRATION

12/16/2016: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER STAYING PETITION PROCEEDINGS PENDING CONCLUSION OF ARBITRATION

Case Management Order - BC390969-JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

1/18/2017: Case Management Order - BC390969-JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order -

1/19/2017: Minute Order -

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - ENTRY OF ORDER RE NOTICE OF MOTION OF THIRD PARTY MULTIPLAN, INC. TO SEAL (COORDINATED CASE NO. BS 162807); FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

2/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - ENTRY OF ORDER RE NOTICE OF MOTION OF THIRD PARTY MULTIPLAN, INC. TO SEAL (COORDINATED CASE NO. BS 162807); FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement - BC390969-JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Date: April 19,2017 Time: 11:00 a.m. Dept.: 308

4/12/2017: Case Management Statement - BC390969-JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Date: April 19,2017 Time: 11:00 a.m. Dept.: 308

Minute Order -

4/17/2017: Minute Order -

Case Management Statement - BC390969-JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

7/5/2017: Case Management Statement - BC390969-JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - -

7/12/2017: Minute Order - -

Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6) - BC390969-

8/11/2017: Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6) - BC390969-

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B296487); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docketat 4:07 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Seal (by Prime Entities) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:37 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Submission of Proposed Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,948 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2009
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • DocketPetition; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • DocketMotion for an Order; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • DocketMotion for an Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUND. HEALTH PLAN INC. [800317] is a litigant

Latest cases where ALVARADO EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY EMERGENCY MEDICAL is a litigant