Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2016 at 16:35:26 (UTC).

PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. VS MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 02/11/2010 PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5583

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC.

Defendant

GOMEZ MAXIMILIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK ROBERT W. LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/ECECUTION RE WRIT ISSUED ) Filed by Court-Other County/State

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Appl for Writ/Abstract (WRIT ISSUED LOS ANGELES) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs (CREDIT 9,100.00 INTEREST 20,743.69 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Application - Misc (FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PARTIAL AS TO DEBTOR MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PARTIAL AS TO MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment ($62,885.37 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • Default Judgment (PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(d); ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • Request for Dismissal (DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • Declaration (in support of default judgment; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Default Entered (AS TO: MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ, an indiv ONLY CRT JG SUBM TO F ON 5-27-10 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO MAXIMILIANO GOMEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC055583    Hearing Date: December 23, 2020    Dept: C

PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC v. GOMEZ

CASE NO.: VC055583

HEARING: 12/23/2020

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#6

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC’s motion for assignment order is GRANTED. CCP §708.510.

Moving Party to give notice.

No Opposition filed as of December 18, 2020.

Plaintiff obtained a Judgment against Defendant on February 11, 2010. Plaintiff asserts that the judgment remains unsatisfied, and seeks an assignment order pursuant to CCP §708.510 as to payments due or to become due to the judgment debtor stemming from payments, monies, and commissions payable to Defendant by his employer, Forward Management Cerritos, Inc.. (See Blanda Decl., ¶¶4-8.)

“Except as otherwise provided by law, upon application of the judgment creditor on noticed motion, the court may order the judgment debtor to assign to the judgment creditor or to a receiver … all or part of a right to payment due or to become due, whether or not the right is conditioned on future developments….” (CCP §708.510(a).) In determining whether an assignment order should issue, the Court should consider (1) the reasonable requirements of a judgment debtor who is a natural person and any dependents on the judgement debtor; (2) other payments the judgment debtor must make in satisfaction of other judgments and wage assignments; (3) the amount remaining to be due on this judgment; and (4) the amount of the right to payment that is being assigned to the creditor. (CCP §708.510(c).) In conjunction with an application for an assignment order, a judgment creditor may seek a restraining order preventing the judgment debtor from assigning or otherwise disposing of the right assigned to creditor under CCP §708.510. (CCP §708.520(a).)

Here, Plaintiff has served and filed a noticed motion which shows that the judgment is not satisfied, and that there is right to future payments. Defendant has not opposed the instant motion despite having received proper service.

The Court grants the Plaintiff/Judgment Creditor’s request pursuant to CCP §708.510, and will sign the Proposed Order submitted with the moving papers.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premier Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK ROBERT W. LAW OFFICES OF