This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 12:57:37 (UTC).

POSITRON SYSTEMS INC VS WYLE LABORATORIES INC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2015 POSITRON SYSTEMS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WYLE LABORATORIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5462

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POSITRON SYSTEMS INC.

Defendant and Respondent

WYLE LABORATORIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CALDEWELL LESLIE & PROCTOR PC

CROWTHER ROBYN C. ESQ.

CROWTHER ROBYN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KULA DONALD J. ESQ.

AMANDA BONN

MICHAEL A. OBLON

VINETT BHATIA (PRO HAC VICE)

BONN AMANDA

VICE VINETT BHATIA PRO HAC

ADAMSON MICHAEL BRENT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF JENNA G. FARLEIGH IN SUPPORT OF WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS IN CONNECTION WITH WYLE'S OPPOSITIONS TO POSITRON'S VARIOUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

5/28/2018: DECLARATION OF JENNA G. FARLEIGH IN SUPPORT OF WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS IN CONNECTION WITH WYLE'S OPPOSITIONS TO POSITRON'S VARIOUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF POSITRON'S EXPERT JAMES B

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF POSITRON'S EXPERT JAMES B

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE POSITRON'S ARGUMENT THAT WYLE "SMEARED ITS R

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE POSITRON'S ARGUMENT THAT WYLE "SMEARED ITS R

REDACTED PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF JEFFREY CUSKEY

5/29/2018: REDACTED PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF JEFFREY CUSKEY

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS LODGED IN CONNECTION WITH POSITRON'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAIN

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS LODGED IN CONNECTION WITH POSITRON'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAIN

POSITRON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE WYLE'S EXPERTS FROM PRESENTING EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL ISSUES AND/OR ULTIMATE ISSUES OF FACT THAT ARE IN THE PROVI

5/29/2018: POSITRON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE WYLE'S EXPERTS FROM PRESENTING EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL ISSUES AND/OR ULTIMATE ISSUES OF FACT THAT ARE IN THE PROVI

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS LODGED IN CONNECTION WITH POSITRON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS LODGED IN CONNECTION WITH POSITRON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

POSITRON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC. FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT OR INQUIRY REGARDING THE ACCURACY OF ITS B

5/29/2018: POSITRON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WYLE LABORATORIES, INC. FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT OR INQUIRY REGARDING THE ACCURACY OF ITS B

DECLARATION OF JENNA G. FARLEIGH IN SUPPORT OF WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S VARIOUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

5/29/2018: DECLARATION OF JENNA G. FARLEIGH IN SUPPORT OF WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S VARIOUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

WYLE LABORATORWS INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE WYLE'S EXPERTS MARK LUMER AND KRISTEN PARMELEE FROM PRESENTING EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL ISSUES AND/OK

5/29/2018: WYLE LABORATORWS INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE WYLE'S EXPERTS MARK LUMER AND KRISTEN PARMELEE FROM PRESENTING EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL ISSUES AND/OK

WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

5/29/2018: WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS IN CONNECTION WITH WYLE'S OPPOSITIONS TO POSITRON'S VARIOUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

5/29/2018: WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL RECORDS IN CONNECTION WITH WYLE'S OPPOSITIONS TO POSITRON'S VARIOUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, INQUIRY OR ARGUMENT RE POSITRON'S NOW. WITHDRAWN TRADE SECRET DISCLOSURES

5/29/2018: WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO POSITRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, INQUIRY OR ARGUMENT RE POSITRON'S NOW. WITHDRAWN TRADE SECRET DISCLOSURES

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, INQUIRY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING POSITRON'S NOW-WITHDRAWN TRADE SECRET DISCLOSU

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT POSITRON SYSTEMS, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, INQUIRY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING POSITRON'S NOW-WITHDRAWN TRADE SECRET DISCLOSU

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/31/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

280 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Positron Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Notice of Appearance; Filed by Wyle Laboratories, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing - Other (name extension) (On Defendant's Objections to Entry of Judgment) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing - Other : On Defendant's Objections to Entry of Judgm...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Order (name extension) (RE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing - Other (name extension) (On Defendant's Objections to Entry of Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing - Other : On Defendant's Objections to Entry of Judgm...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Reply in Further Support of Defendant Wyle's Objections To Plaintiff Positron's Proposed Form of Judgment; Filed by Positron Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
514 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONEERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANC IONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • COMPLAINT JUR TRIAL DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Positron Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wyle Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KULA DONALD J