This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 14:02:33 (UTC).

PONDEL WILKINSON INC. VS GREENWOOD HALL, INC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2015 PONDEL WILKINSON INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREENWOOD HALL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5171

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PONDEL WILKINSON INC.

Defendant

GREENWOOD HALL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEWS JR. ARTURO E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Pondel Wilkinson Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Pondel Wilkinson Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Pondel Wilkinson Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Pondel Wilkinson Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greenwood Hall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEWS ARTURO E