This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 09:25:36 (UTC).

POMPEYO SILVA VS MANUEL ANTHONY VALDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2014 POMPEYO SILVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MANUEL ANTHONY VALDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6713

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SILVA POMPEYO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

PADILLA HECTOR ARMANDO

RODRIGUEZ CARLOS ALBERTO

VALDEZ MANUEL ANTHONY

WALT'S TOW SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT SCOTT SHTOFMAN

LAW OFFICE OF JOEL W. BARUCH PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ STEVEN L. ESQ.

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

SALLEY ROBERT B. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Pompeyo Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; (Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
360 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION RE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pompeyo Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pompeyo Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pompeyo Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pompeyo Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALT'S TOW SERVICE is a litigant