Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2016 at 16:49:13 (UTC).

PIERRE DANIEL VS ICM PARTNERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/25/2014 PIERRE DANIEL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ICM PARTNERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5610

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DANIEL PIERRE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

EFS ENTERTAINMENT

ICM PARTNERS

IM GLOBAL OCTANE DIVISON

WAYANS MARLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

REISNER & KING LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BRIGGS WILLIAM J. II ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) RACEINATIONAL ORIGIN HARASSMENT IN VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

8/25/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) RACEINATIONAL ORIGIN HARASSMENT IN VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/9/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF RICK ALVAREZ IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

11/5/2014: DECLARATION OF RICK ALVAREZ IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF MARLON WAYANS IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

11/5/2014: DECLARATION OF MARLON WAYANS IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

11/13/2014: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS? SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTISLAPP) PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P.I 425.16 PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS? FEES

11/26/2014: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS? SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTISLAPP) PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P.I 425.16 PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS? FEES

ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE

12/5/2014: ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

12/9/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

12/31/2014: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

1/6/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

1/6/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; L DECLARATION OF WILLIAM BRIGGS

1/22/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; L DECLARATION OF WILLIAM BRIGGS

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF PIERRE DANIEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WAYANS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

2/25/2015: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF PIERRE DANIEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WAYANS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO WAYANS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

3/5/2015: DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO WAYANS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

DECLARATION OF CELESTE M. BRECHT IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

3/5/2015: DECLARATION OF CELESTE M. BRECHT IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT MARION WAYANS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

3/9/2015: PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT MARION WAYANS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

STIPULATION TO DISMISS EFS ENTERTAINMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLING AGREEMENT

6/10/2015: STIPULATION TO DISMISS EFS ENTERTAINMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLING AGREEMENT

ORDER RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS IM GLOBAL AND TOLLING AGREEMENT

6/11/2015: ORDER RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS IM GLOBAL AND TOLLING AGREEMENT

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Order (RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS IM GLOBAL AND TOLLING AGREEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Stipulation (TO DISMISS IM GLOBAL AND TOLLING AGREEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Stipulation (TO DISMISS EFS ENTERTAINMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLING AGREEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Ntc Elect Proceed 5.1 Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Attorney for Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • Notice of Appeal Filed by Attorney for Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Notice (OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Objection Document (TYO DEFENDANT MARLON WAYANS' PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON HIS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2014
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Declaration (OF RICK ALVAREZ IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Notice of Motion (AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Declaration (OF MARLON WAYANS IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT ICM PARTNERS ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC555610    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 73

9/10/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

DANIEL vs. ICM, etc., et al. (BC555610)

Counsel for defendant/moving party Marlon Wayans: William Briggs; Celeste Brecht; Eric Bakewell (Venable)

Counsel for plaintiff/opposing party: Adam Reisner; Tessa King (Reisner & King)

Defendant Wayans’ motion for attorneys’ fees and costs (filed 6/10/20)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff’s objections to defendant’s evidence (filed 8/14/20): Sustained: 21, 25, 30, 32, 33, 35 (if objecting to Ex. 46, not 45); remainder overruled.

Defendant’s objections to Daniel and Ebelhar declarations (filed 8/26/20): Overruled.

No further tentative ruling. The court will hear argument regarding fees and take the matter under submission.

The costs issue will be deferred to the hearing on 10/26/20 (Plaintiff’s motion to strike/tax costs). However, the court encourages the parties to meet and confer regarding costs and advise the court in a joint statement no later than the last day to file the opposition papers for that motion.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIGGS WILLIAM JOSEPH