This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 09:14:43 (UTC).

TY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2015 TY was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN and HALM, HOWARD L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3494

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

HALM, HOWARD L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

TORRES CHRIS

TORRES CHRIS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

HOLLOWAY WILLIAM

Defendants

GRIMES JAMES B. M.D.

HEALTH SOUTH CORPORATION

SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF

DOE 7: VIKAS R. PUNJABI DO

KERN BONE & JOINT SPECIALISTS

HEALTHSOUTH BAKERSFIELD REHABILITATION

THC ORANGE COUNTY INC.

ANESTHEISA VALLEY

IPE JOSEPH M.D.

DOE 6: RICHARD A. PAULSEN CRNA

UCLA MEDICAL CENTER SANTA MONICA

PAULSEN RICHARD A.

KINDRED HOSPITAL-LOS ANGELES (DOE 1)

HOLLOWAY WILLIAM

DOE 8: LAWRENCE R. ROUBEN MD

GHAI VIKAS M.D.

ESTATE OF PHYLLIS MCQUILLIAMS

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONES KYLE W.

HART II HOYT

Defendant Attorneys

HALL HIEATT & CONNELY LLP

PACKER ROBERT B.

OSBORN PATRICK J.

PATRICK J. OSBORN ESQ

CONNELY MARK B.

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

THELEN DENNIS R.

LEBEAU THELEN

LAMB MICHAEL V.

WAINWRIGHT DANIEL L.

MISH ESQ. ALAN J.

PACKER O'LEARY & CORSON

MCCORMICK BARSTOW SHEPPARD WAYTE&CARRUTH

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD STOCKAPLER

THELEN LEBEAU

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOL

GONZALEZ MICHAEL

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, JAMES B. GRIMES, M.D., TO CHANGE VENUE

6/2/2015: ORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, JAMES B. GRIMES, M.D., TO CHANGE VENUE

DECLARATION OF JAMES B. GRIMES, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

4/8/2015: DECLARATION OF JAMES B. GRIMES, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2016: ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE

6/8/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER

5/15/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/8/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO KERN COUNTY BASED ON IMPROPER COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF JENNIFER J. HENDERSON IN SUPPORT

4/8/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO KERN COUNTY BASED ON IMPROPER COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF JENNIFER J. HENDERSON IN SUPPORT

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/14/2015: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/19/2015: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/2/2015: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/16/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/25/2015: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/3/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

3/17/2015: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT SEC. 474 CCP

5/13/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT SEC. 474 CCP

DEFENDANT, JAMES B. GRIMES, M.D.'S, REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

5/21/2015: DEFENDANT, JAMES B. GRIMES, M.D.'S, REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B287436); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Torres, Chris, individually and as (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Torres, Chris, individually and as (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued (ABSTRACT ISSUED AND MAILED IN SASE ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Assignment of Judgment (ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED. ); Filed by Attorney for Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by Torres, Chris, individually and as (Plaintiff); William Holloway (Plaintiff); Estate of Phyllis McQuilliams and (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
965 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2015
  • First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-01-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • Notice; Filed by MD, NADIM W. SARKIES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • Notice (OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBIT C IN SUPPORT OF DEFT NADIM SARKIES, M.D.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2007
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2007
  • Notice; Filed by M.D., SHANKAR RAMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.