This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 16:46:07 (UTC).

PHILIP PEIRSON VS. S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2012 PHILIP PEIRSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against S J AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN, AMY D. HOGUE, WILLIAM BARRY and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6087

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

AMY D. HOGUE

WILLIAM BARRY

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEIRSON PHILIP

Claimant

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 50

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-25

R&D STEEL INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES CLIFFORD JOHNSON DEHNER WONG

Claimant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. BIARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC

Cross Defendant Attorney

VEATCH CARLSON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING

4/26/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/24/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

7/1/2013: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

7/1/2013: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING FOR SAME

12/18/2013: ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING FOR SAME

DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE THE CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. AMOROSO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

1/9/2014: DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE THE CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. AMOROSO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF MARTIN MORENO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVERJBIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/9/2014: DECLARATION OF MARTIN MORENO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVERJBIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/13/2014: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. AMOROSO; ETC

2/5/2014: DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. AMOROSO; ETC

Proof of Service

2/19/2014: Proof of Service

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN 1. BELL IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMEI?AL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE CROSSCOMPLAINT

2/19/2014: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN 1. BELL IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMEI?AL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BIFURCATE CROSSCOMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF PERSONS MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF S.J. AMOROSO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND RECOVERY OF COSTS OF $1,530.00 AGAINST DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO PURSUANT

2/20/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF PERSONS MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF S.J. AMOROSO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND RECOVERY OF COSTS OF $1,530.00 AGAINST DEFENDANT S.J. AMOROSO PURSUANT

Minute Order

2/26/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/12/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/12/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

4/1/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

4/3/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/12/2014: Minute Order

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. ON 5/02/13 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Stipulation and Order ((TAKE MOTION OF 04-03-14 O/C) (DOCUMENT WAS LOST IN TRANSIT) ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Notice (OF TAKING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OFF CALENDAR ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Order (RULING RE MOTION TO SEVER/ BIFURCATE CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2012
  • Notice of Lien Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Notice (OF INTENT TO IDENTIFY AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.