Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 04:52:16 (UTC).

PHILIP NEAL RICHARDS VS REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2013 PHILIP NEAL RICHARDS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3169

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RICHARDS PHILIP NEAL

Defendants and Respondents

AZTEC FINANCIAL

AZTEC TD SERVICE CO INC

DOES 1-20

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC.

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LK PROFESSIONAL LAW GROUP

AGEGE CHARLES ORIGHO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PALLER BRUCE B.

PALLER BRUCE BARCLAY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

1/16/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/1/2018: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL; MEMORANDUN OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF CHARLES 0. AGEGE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/14/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL; MEMORANDUN OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF CHARLES 0. AGEGE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

1/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

5/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Motion re: - MOTION RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

8/28/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PREDATORY LENDING PRACTICES (FIN. CODE ? 4970); ETC

6/25/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PREDATORY LENDING PRACTICES (FIN. CODE ? 4970); ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/11/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/11/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8/2/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRUCE B. PALLER C.C..P. ?473

9/26/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRUCE B. PALLER C.C..P. ?473

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

1/15/2014: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

1/15/2014: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

REPLY DECLARATION OF BRUCE B. PALLER TO PLATNTIFF?S OPPOSITION

1/16/2014: REPLY DECLARATION OF BRUCE B. PALLER TO PLATNTIFF?S OPPOSITION

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

1/17/2014: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order -

5/20/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

12/13/2017: Minute Order -

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion - Other (to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (ReArbitration) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award); Filed by Rehabbers Financial Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (ReArbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Arbitration) of 07/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Philip Neal Richards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Philip Neal Richards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. PREDATORY LENDING PRACTICES (FIN. CODE 4970); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Philip Neal Richards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC513169    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 74

BC513169 PHILIP NEAL RICHARDS VS REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC ET AL

Defendant’s Unopposed Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

TENTATIVE RULING: The petition is GRANTED. The court sets an OSC re dismissal for March 3, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZTEC FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases where AZTEC T.D. SERVICE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLER BRUCE B