This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 21:16:24 (UTC).

PHIL WALSH VS HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC

Case Summary

On 06/12/2015 PHIL WALSH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4863

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WALSH PHIL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MYBEDBUGLAWYER INC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEAVITT SCOTT M. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/27/2016: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE ? 1941.1); ETC

6/12/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE ? 1941.1); ETC

SUMMONS

6/12/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

7/30/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/17/2015: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/17/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/6/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 97; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Hollywood 7 Star Motel, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by Hollywood 7 Star Motel, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Phil Walsh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Phil Walsh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 1941.1); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEAVITT SCOTT MICHAEL