This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 14:04:10 (UTC).

CASEY A. OLSEN, APC VS. KELLY C. KANE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 CASEY A OLSEN, APC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against KELLY C KANE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7972

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASEY A. OLSEN APC DBA

Respondent

KANE KELLY C.

Interested Party

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRUERS STUART EDWARD

Respondent Attorney

SILVERMAN RACHEL SHARON

Other Attorneys

RACHEL S. SILVERMAN

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/11/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

9/12/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

10/16/2018: Minute Order

Brief

10/29/2018: Brief

Proof of Service by Mail

10/30/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Brief

11/9/2018: Brief

Brief

11/15/2018: Brief

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion - Other (Application for Issuance of Order for Sale of Dwelling is continued by the Court and) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Application for Issuance of Order f...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Brief (Reply To Defendant's Responsive Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Request For Issuance Of Order For Sale Of Dwelling; Supplemental Declaration Of Stuart E. Bruers); Filed by APC DBA CASEY A. OLSEN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Brief (Responsive In Opposition To Plaintiff's Request For Issuance Of Order For Sale Of Dwelling); Filed by Kelly C. Kane (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by APC DBA CASEY A. OLSEN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Brief (Supplemental In Support Of Application For Issuance Of Order For Sale Of Dwelling; Declaration Of Stuart E. Bruers; Declaration Of Casey A. Olsen); Filed by APC DBA CASEY A. OLSEN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; (Motion - Other) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Motion - Other)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement (Motion - Enforce Settlement; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2016
  • Notice; Filed by APC DBA CASEY A. OLSEN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by APC DBA CASEY A. OLSEN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • at 08:29 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award (Petition Confirm Arbitration Award; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Kelly C. Kane (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Notice; Filed by APC DBA CASEY A. OLSEN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.