This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2016 at 10:36:35 (UTC).

PETER J. CHESKI VS SANDRA FINCH, MARK FINCH, ELENA FINCH

Case Summary

On 01/14/2013 PETER J CHESKI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANDRA FINCH, MARK FINCH, ELENA FINCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA E. STRATTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9482

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARIA E. STRATTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESKI PETER J.

Defendants

FINCH ELENA

FINCH MARK

FINCH NIKKI

FINCH SANDRA

OXJAL SONIA

DOES 1-50

Administrator

FARRELL MICHAEL P.

Minor

FINCH JEREMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS GLENN DARRYL

Defendant Attorney

ALTHOLZ ANDREW PETER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2013
  • Request-Dismissal (with prejudice - entire action ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Notice-Settlement (of entire case ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Notice-Order to Show Cause (re dismissal ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) (NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Request-Trial Setting Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Answer Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 1/15/13 ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Acknowledgement-Receipt (AND NOTICE ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Acknowledgement-Receipt Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Summons-Issued Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALTHOLZ ANDREW P