Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 09:22:45 (UTC).

PETE E SARANTOPOULOS VS SHEPHERD HOME HEALTH HOME CARE INC

Case Summary

On 08/01/2013 PETE E SARANTOPOULOS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SHEPHERD HOME HEALTH HOME CARE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH R. FEFFER, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, RONALD M. SOHIGIAN and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6945

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SARANTOPOULOUS PETE E.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

SHEPHERD HOME HEALTH CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PALAY LAW FIRM

PALAY DANIEL J.

STRAUSS MICHAEL ANTHONY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RAMSEY WILLIAM R. ESQ.

BRUCE SCHWARTZ

LEE W. DAN

SMITH MARILYN KEOSEYAN

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/28/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Change of Address -

2/2/2018: Notice of Change of Address -

PLAINTIFF'S POST-APPEAL CALCULATION OF DAMAGES

3/16/2018: PLAINTIFF'S POST-APPEAL CALCULATION OF DAMAGES

Minute Order -

4/13/2018: Minute Order -

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SECOND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

8/28/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SECOND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/7/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR POST JUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT ORDER

5/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR POST JUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT ORDER

ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION; OSC RE STRIKING

12/2/2013: ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION; OSC RE STRIKING

NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

11/7/2014: NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

Minute Order -

11/20/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

3/12/2015: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

Minute Order -

4/17/2015: Minute Order -

TRIAL STIPULATIONS

4/27/2015: TRIAL STIPULATIONS

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/12/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

5/13/2015: NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

STIPULATION TO ADMIT ADDITIONAL TRIAL EXHIBIT; ORDER

5/27/2015: STIPULATION TO ADMIT ADDITIONAL TRIAL EXHIBIT; ORDER

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

7/12/2015: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

12/11/2017: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (of W Dan Lee, Esq) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by W. DAN LEE (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Proof of Service on Order Granting Defendant's Counsel, M.E.T.A.L. Law Group, LLP's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Shepherd Home Health Care, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of W Dan Lee, Esq)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by W. DAN LEE (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Assignment Order to Medicare); Filed by Pete E. Sarantopoulous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Assignment Order to Medi-Cal); Filed by Pete E. Sarantopoulous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Assignment Order to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company); Filed by Pete E. Sarantopoulous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Assignment Order to U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs); Filed by Pete E. Sarantopoulous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Assignment Order to Regal Medical Group, Inc.); Filed by Pete E. Sarantopoulous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
253 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pete E. Sarantopoulous (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: (1) FAILURE TO PAY WAGES OWED; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 09:04 AM in Department 39; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 09:04 AM in Department 39; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 09:04 AM in Department 39; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 09:04 AM in Department 39; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC516945    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 39

Pete E. Sarantopoulos v. Shepherd Home Health Home Care Inc., et al., BC516945

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant by W. Dan Lee: GRANTED

The moving papers demonstrate substantial compliance with the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362. At the hearing, moving counsel is to advise the court as to whether he has confirmed that his client's stated address is current. 

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEPHERD HOME HEALTH CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY WILLIAM R. ESQ.