Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2016 at 14:03:05 (UTC).

PERRY WILLIAMS VS ROBERT JOHN RUSTMAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2013 PERRY WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT JOHN RUSTMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, GAIL FEUER and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8662

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

GAIL FEUER

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY WILLIAMS

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

ROBERT JOHN RUSTMAN

THE HERTZ CORPORATION (MSJ GTD)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MINDY S. BISH

LAW OFFICES OF LARRY H. PARKER INC.

Defendant Attorney

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/26/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/16/2013: ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/8/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

6/12/2013: Minute Order

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

6/12/2013: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S UNOPPOSED EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. HEATON; [PR

6/12/2013: DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S UNOPPOSED EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. HEATON; [PR

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/13/2013: AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING

6/13/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

DEFENDANT?S SEPARATELY-BOUND. EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/27/2014: DEFENDANT?S SEPARATELY-BOUND. EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. HEATON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/27/2014: DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. HEATON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POJNTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/27/2014: DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POJNTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S FAILURE TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/9/2014: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S FAILURE TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/13/2014: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

5/13/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/14/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

8/11/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND PROSECUTE

8/22/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND PROSECUTE

Minute Order

11/19/2014: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2014
  • Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (RE: Motion For Summary Judgment ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Order (GRANTING UNOPPOSED MSJ AS TO DEFT THE HERTZ CORPORATION ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Default Entered (ROBERT JOHN RUSTMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR RUSTMAN- #3.4. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Statement of Damages Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR RUSTMAN- NEED STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Statement-Case Management (PARTY SERVED: HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: THER HERTZ CORPORATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: ROBERT JOHN RUSTMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Complaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant