This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:33:48 (UTC).

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC VS SERVCORP LOS ANGELES LL

Case Summary

On 02/04/2016 PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SERVCORP LOS ANGELES LL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9292

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

SERVCORP LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOCHFELSEN & KANI LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2/4/2016: COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

2/4/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/26/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/29/2016: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND (2) OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

2/29/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND (2) OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/29/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/4/2016: ANSWER OF PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/6/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Unknown

4/7/2016: Unknown

Unknown

4/21/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

4/26/2016: Minute Order

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

4/26/2016: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

6/6/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/6/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/7/2016: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 47; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2016
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND (2) OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Servcorp Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Servcorp Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Servcorp Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant