This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2018 at 17:16:13 (UTC).

PERAZZOLO, INC. VS RUBICON B HACIENDA, LLC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 PERAZZOLO, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUBICON B HACIENDA, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1541

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERAZZOLO INC.

Defendants

EVANS ROBERT GRAHM III

DOES 1 TO 50

RUBICON B HACIENDA LLC

SMART GRID CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG D. WEINSTEIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by PERAZZOLO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by PERAZZOLO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERAZZOLO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART GRID CONSTRUCTION is a litigant