This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 05:38:17 (UTC).

PEOPLES CAPITAL AND LEASING CORP VS TEU PRODUCT COMPANY ET

Case Summary

On 12/31/2009 PEOPLES CAPITAL AND LEASING CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEU PRODUCT COMPANY ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRUCE MITCHELL and RITA MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9005

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRUCE MITCHELL

RITA MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE'S CAPITAL AND LEASING CORP.

Defendants and Respondents

BLUDYAN SHOGIK

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ENMEX CORP.

NADJARIAN MIKE

NADJARIAN MKRTICH

STELLA POLARIS LLC.

TEU PRODUCT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN EDMUND JOSEPH ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment-Partial; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketAMENDED JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketAMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF EDMUND SHERMAN RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketSUMMARY OF CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION, EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF BRUCE MITCHELL, COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE, JUDGE PRO TEM FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PETER J. ESPOSITO IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND TURNOVER ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION, EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by People's Capital And Leasing Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketOrder; Filed by People's Capital And Leasing Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by People's Capital And Leasing Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by People's Capital And Leasing Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less