This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2015 at 00:36:45 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $96,055.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 02/04/2010 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 96,055 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4787

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

MICHAEL THOMAS CARRANZA

NINTY-SIX THOUSAND FIFTY-FIVE DOLLARS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYES ROSABALLA E.

Defendant Attorney

BOYCE LESLIE ANN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

2/4/2010: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

4/14/2010: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order

5/11/2010: Minute Order

MINUTE ORDER

7/13/2010: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

8/3/2010: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE. OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PROPOUNDED INTERROGAIORIES AND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SANCTIONS (CCP 2030.290, SUBD. (B) 2030.

11/2/2010: NOTICE. OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PROPOUNDED INTERROGAIORIES AND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SANCTIONS (CCP 2030.290, SUBD. (B) 2030.

NOIICE OF UNAVATI ABILITY

11/4/2010: NOIICE OF UNAVATI ABILITY

Minute Order

11/4/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/15/2010: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/15/2011: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

3/9/2011: Minute Order

CLAIMANT MICHAEL CARRANZAS EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PETITIONERS MOTION(S) FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OK IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR OPPOSITION, OR IN TH

3/9/2011: CLAIMANT MICHAEL CARRANZAS EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PETITIONERS MOTION(S) FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OK IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR OPPOSITION, OR IN TH

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

4/6/2011: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Minute Order

5/12/2011: Minute Order

CLAIMANT MICHAEL CARRANZAS OPPOSITION TO P1TITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE CLAIM

5/12/2011: CLAIMANT MICHAEL CARRANZAS OPPOSITION TO P1TITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE CLAIM

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE

6/3/2011: STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE

JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION

6/9/2011: JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION

Minute Order

6/9/2011: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2011
  • Judgment (AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • Stipulation (FOR JUDGEMENT OF FORFEITURE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO STRIKE CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEIT- URE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY 4/7/11 THROUGH 4/27/11 ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • Ex-Parte Application (CLAIMANT MICHAEL CARRANZA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PETITIONER'S MOTION... ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • Motion (TO STRIKE CLAIM OPPOSING FORGEITURE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER ISSUING EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Notice of Motion (DN MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PROPOUNDED INTERROGATORIES AND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYCE LESLIE ANN