This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2019 at 19:26:47 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $936,030.00 IN US CURRE

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 936,030 00 IN US CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6730

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Respondents

NINE HUNDRED THIRTY-SIX THOUSAND THIRTY

THIRTY NINE HUNDRED -SIX THOUSAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLD CRAIG M. DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

1/14/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/17/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

) MEMORANDUM AND DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE LUIS MARTINEZ OF DUE DILIGENCE SEARCH FOR ADDRESS OF JOEL LOPEZ ALVARADO

2/20/2014: ) MEMORANDUM AND DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE LUIS MARTINEZ OF DUE DILIGENCE SEARCH FOR ADDRESS OF JOEL LOPEZ ALVARADO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS US. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON MARTIN A. CASTRO

2/20/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS US. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON MARTIN A. CASTRO

Minute Order

3/17/2014: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

3/19/2014: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

5/14/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/11/2014: Minute Order

NEW EXH1BIT 9 CLARIFYTNG SEIZURE OF MONEY DISCREPANCY AND CIVIL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS

7/15/2014: NEW EXH1BIT 9 CLARIFYTNG SEIZURE OF MONEY DISCREPANCY AND CIVIL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

9/26/2014: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

Minute Order

9/26/2014: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Default Judgment; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • NEW EXH1BIT 9 CLARIFYTNG SEIZURE OF MONEY DISCREPANCY AND CIVIL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Gold, Craig M., Deputy District Attorney (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS US. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON MARTIN A. CASTRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Memorandum - Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • ) MEMORANDUM AND DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE LUIS MARTINEZ OF DUE DILIGENCE SEARCH FOR ADDRESS OF JOEL LOPEZ ALVARADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less