This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2015 at 00:51:45 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $9,075.00 IN U S CURREN

Case Summary

On 02/02/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 9,075 00 IN U S CURREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRETT C. KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8933

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRETT C. KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

A 2004 BMW 645 C VIN#WBAEK734X4B322854

NINE THOUSAND SEVENTY-FIVE DOLLARS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR OFRFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SEC. 11470, ET SEQ.

2/2/2009: PETITION FOR OFRFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SEC. 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2009: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/26/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

5/18/2009: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

MINUTE ORDER

5/18/2009: MINUTE ORDER

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

5/18/2009: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ETC.

5/18/2009: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ETC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2009
  • Application for Entry of Judgment ( DEFAULT ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Judgment ( DEFAULT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less