This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2019 at 03:34:28 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $88,720.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 88,720 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR GREENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8683

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VICTOR GREENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

EIGHTY-EIGHT THOUSAND SEVEN HUNDRED TWEN-

TWEN- EIGHTY-EIGHT THOUSAND SEVEN HUNDRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

1/21/2009: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2009: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION ; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED

3/23/2009: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION ; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

3/23/2009: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

Minute Order

3/23/2009: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2009
  • at 09:35 AM in Department 66; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • at 2:45 PM in Department 66; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION ; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CONCURRENLTY HEREWITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less