This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2015 at 00:19:36 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $80,979.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 80,979 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRETT C. KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8490

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRETT C. KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

ADEBE WHYTE

EIGHTY THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED SEVENTY-NINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

KESSEL ALEX R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2009: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

2/24/2009: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/26/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. DOOLEY: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP

6/10/2009: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. DOOLEY: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPP

ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS

7/8/2009: ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS

ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS

7/8/2009: ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS

Minute Order

7/8/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF JULY 8, 2009 RULING

7/15/2009: NOTICE OF JULY 8, 2009 RULING

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

9/10/2009: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER ISSUING EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION, DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. DOOLEY, ETC

9/10/2009: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER ISSUING EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION, DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. DOOLEY, ETC

ORDER (STRIKING CLAIM OF ADEBE WHYTE)

10/6/2009: ORDER (STRIKING CLAIM OF ADEBE WHYTE)

ORDER (STRIKING CLAIM OF ADEBE WHYTE)

10/6/2009: ORDER (STRIKING CLAIM OF ADEBE WHYTE)

Minute Order

10/6/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF OCTOBER 6, 2009 RULING

10/9/2009: NOTICE OF OCTOBER 6, 2009 RULING

JUDGMENT (FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRITUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY)

11/30/2009: JUDGMENT (FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRITUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY)

JUDGMENT (FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY)

11/30/2009: JUDGMENT (FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY)

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRITUTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CO

11/30/2009: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRITUTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CO

Minute Order

11/30/2009: Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2009
  • Default Judgment (OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • Application for Entry of Judgment (PURSUANT TO DEFAULT ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • Notice of Ruling (Motion to stike Claim Opposing Forfeiture on 10/6/09 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • Notice of Motion (Motion to strike claim Opposing Forfeiture ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • Notice of Continuance (9/30/09 cont 10/06/09 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Order ( COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO INTERROGS AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Motion to Compel (responses to Interrogatories and Demand for Production and Inspection of Documents ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less