This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2015 at 00:51:51 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $67,331.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 02/02/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 67,331 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRETT C. KLEIN and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8935

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRETT C. KLEIN

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

SIXTY-SEVEN THOUSAND THREE HUNDRED THIRTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

ROGER J. ROSEN

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET. SEQ.

2/2/2009: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET. SEQ.

Minute Order

7/16/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/5/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/23/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

3/10/2010: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMITTED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. DOOLEY

5/26/2010: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMITTED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. DOOLEY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PROPOUNDED INTERROGATORIES AND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS (CCP 2030.290, SUBD. (B) 2030.250, 2031.250,

5/26/2010: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PROPOUNDED INTERROGATORIES AND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS (CCP 2030.290, SUBD. (B) 2030.250, 2031.250,

Minute Order

6/24/2010: Minute Order

MINUTE ORDER

8/24/2010: MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order

8/24/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/31/2010: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE

8/31/2010: STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE

Minute Order

12/17/2010: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO AMEND AUGUST 31,2010 JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTIRBUTION NUNC PRO TUNC

12/17/2010: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO AMEND AUGUST 31,2010 JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTIRBUTION NUNC PRO TUNC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2011
  • Request ($107.00 14 COPIES 4 CERTIFY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • Request ($51.00 2 COPIES, 2 CERTS. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO AMEND AUGUST 31, 2010 JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION NUNC PRO TUNC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO RACHEL PERAZA ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO MARTIN ACEVEDO ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PROPOUNDED INTERROGATORIES AND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMITTED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Notice (of Case Reassignment; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • Notice ( of stay of proceedings due to pending criminal case. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture ( AS TO RACHEL PERAZA FOR $9,500.00. ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture ( AS TO CLAIMANT MARTIN ACEVEDO ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less