This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2019 at 22:21:24 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $65,449.41 INC U S CURR

Case Summary

On 02/03/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 65,449 41 INC U S CURR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6942

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimants

ASHLEY DAVIS

DAVIS ASHLEY

Defendants and Respondents

ONE 2006 SUZUKI GSX-100 #VIN JS1GT76A9621

ONE 2008 SUZUKI GSX-R VIN# JS1GT77AX82104

ONE 2009 TOYOTA TACOMA VIN# 5TENX62N59Z65

SIXTY-FIVE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED FORTY-

FORTY- SIXTY-FIVE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REYES ROSABELLA E.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

2/3/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/5/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/5/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

AMENDED PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

2/20/2014: AMENDED PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

3/27/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES, PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON SEAN CHRISTIAN DAVIS, AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RE

3/27/2014: DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES, PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON SEAN CHRISTIAN DAVIS, AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RE

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

3/27/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

Minute Order

4/1/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/2/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/19/2014: Unknown

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/3/2014: CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

6/3/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND COURT HEARING DATES

6/9/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND COURT HEARING DATES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND COURT HEARING DATES

7/2/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND COURT HEARING DATES

Minute Order

9/17/2014: Minute Order

STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER OR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED ROPERTY

10/30/2014: STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER OR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED ROPERTY

STLPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/30/2014: STLPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

10/31/2014: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 69; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Stipulation; Filed by People of the State of California (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Judgment; Filed by People of the State of California (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • STLPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER OR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED ROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2014
  • DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES, PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON SEAN CHRISTIAN DAVIS, AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURN RECEIPT ON ASHLEY L1NETTE DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Amended Petition; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less